Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate 2023 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR303

Recognizing March 23, 2023, as San Patricio County Day.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR304

Recognizing March 9, 2023, as World Kidney Day.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR305

Recognizing the City of Palestine for its contributions to the state.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR306

Recognizing March 1, 2023, as Uvalde County Day.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR307

Congratulating Thompson Brewer McLeod for achieving the rank of Eagle Scout.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR308

Recognizing March 16, 2023, as Hill County Day.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR309

Recognizing April 4, 2023, as Texas Association of Neurological Surgeons Day.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR31

Recognizing Deborah J. Kilgore for 50 years of service to Alpha Kappa Alpha Sorority, Incorporated.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR310

In memory of Richard Wade Carter.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR311

In memory of Carolyn Cline Mendoza.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR312

In memory of Charles J. Hensley.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR313

Recognizing Cynthia Horn on the occasion of her 100th birthday.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR314

In memory of Mary Martha West.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR315

Recognizing March 15, 2023, as Minority Business Enterprise Public Policy Day.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR316

Recognizing March 15, 2023, as Texas Small Business Development Center Day.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records