Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate 2023 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR75

Congratulating Charity Ballmann on her selection as one of the 25 Outstanding Texas Nurses for 2022 by the Texas Nurses Association.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR76

Congratulating Kavin Heugatter of the Wise County Office of Emergency Management on his receipt of a Life Saving Medal.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR77

Congratulating Joel Bartlett of the Wise County Office of Emergency Management on his receipt of a Life Saving Medal.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR78

Congratulating Brandon Daugherty of the Wise County Office of Emergency Management on his receipt of a Life Saving Medal.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR79

Congratulating Colton Thomas of the Wise County Office of Emergency Management on his receipt of a Life Saving Medal.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR8

Adopting Permanent Rules of the Senate of the 88th Legislature.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR80

Congratulating Danny Byler of the Wise County Office of Emergency Management on his receipt of a Life Saving Medal.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR81

Congratulating Mindi Andes on her selection as one of the 25 Outstanding Texas Nurses for 2022 by the Texas Nurses Association.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR82

Recognizing January 24, 2023, as Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity Day.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR83

Recognizing April 18, 2023, as Navarro County Day.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR84

Recognizing February 6, 2023, as Kaufman County Day.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR85

Recognizing January 31, 2023, as Rowlett Day.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR86

Commemorating Children's Hospital Day on January 25, 2023.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR87

Recognizing the YMCA Texas Youth and Government Program.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR88

In memory of Matthew Alan Guidry.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records