Texas 2023 88th 2nd C.S.

Texas House Bill HR22 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 07/13/2023

                    H.R. No. 22


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Family and friends will long cherish their memories
 of Stacy Taliaferro Parker, who passed away on May 29, 2023, at the
 age of 52; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Austin on July 9, 1970, the former Stacy Dee
 Taliaferro was the daughter of Jackie and Rebecca Taliaferro and
 grew up with the companionship of two brothers, Brett and Blake; she
 moved with her family to Marble Falls when she was six years old,
 and she went on to graduate from Marble Falls High School; later,
 she attended Baylor University; and
 WHEREAS, A dedicated civil servant, Mrs. Parker enjoyed a
 rewarding career with the office of the Texas Comptroller of Public
 Accounts that spanned more than three decades; over the years, she
 endeared herself to her many colleagues; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Parker's brother Blake introduced her to the
 love of her life, Shea Parker; the couple married on
 October 23, 1999, and they were blessed with three children,
 Bradley, Rylie, and Abigael; admired for her warmth and optimism,
 Mrs. Parker was deeply devoted to her family and was always ready to
 offer guidance and sage advice; throughout her life, she was
 sustained by a deep and abiding faith; and
 WHEREAS, Stacy Parker brightened the world around her with
 her kindness, her generosity of spirit, and her infectious laugh,
 and she will forever be remembered with deep affection by all who
 knew her; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature, 2nd Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the life of
 Stacy Taliaferro Parker and extend sincere sympathy to the members
 of her family: to her husband, Shea Parker; to her children, Bradley
 Jack Taliaferro and his wife, Kelsey, Rylie Shea Parker, and
 Abigael Blake Parker; to her parents, Jack and Becky Taliaferro; to
 her brothers, Brett Taliaferro and Blake Taliaferro and his wife,
 Nikki; to her nephew, Erik Taliaferro; and to her many other
 relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Stacy
 Parker.
 Wilson
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 22 was unanimously adopted by a rising
 vote of the House on July 13, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House