Texas 2023 88th 3rd C.S.

Texas House Bill HCR27 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 11/07/2023

                    H.C.R. No. 27


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Pioneering Texas vintner Hugo Edwin Auler passed
 away on October 14, 2023, at the age of 78, bringing a great loss to
 his family and many friends; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Mary and Hugo Auler, Ed Auler was born in
 Austin on July 28, 1945; while a student at The University of Texas
 at Austin, he met the love of his life, the former Susan Teeple, and
 they were married on June 17, 1967; he enlisted in the U.S. Army
 Reserve, and after completing his law degree, he joined the firm of
 Kendall, Randall, Finch, and Osborne; he also began running his
 family's Fall Creek Ranch in the Hill Country; in 1973, he and his
 wife traveled to France to observe a cattle operation, and at her
 suggestion, they explored the wine country, too; they ultimately
 spent just three days looking at cattle and over two weeks learning
 about wine in various regions; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Auler planted his own small vineyard at home
 within two years and quickly expanded a quarter-acre plot to seven
 and a half acres; in the 1980s, he gave up his law practice and
 purchased 400 acres along the west side of Lake Buchanan to
 establish Fall Creek Vineyards, blazing a trail for the development
 of the Hill Country as a vibrant wine region; over the years, his
 wines garnered hundreds of awards; he was a great champion of the
 state's industry and advocated for legislation that has helped it
 flourish; moreover, he was a mentor to many, and he and his wife
 founded the Austin Food and Wine Festival; and
 WHEREAS, Although wine was his passion, Mr. Auler was
 involved in the energy, real estate, and banking industries as
 well; he was a member of the advisory board of Frost Bank; dedicated
 to his community, he served on the boards of numerous
 organizations, among them St. David's Hospital Foundation and
 St. Andrew's Episcopal School; he was president of the Admirals
 Club of Austin and Tarry House; he received myriad accolades,
 including the People of Vision Award from the Texas Society to
 Prevent Blindness and the Service Award from the Colorado River
 Foundation; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Auler loved the outdoors and traveling the world
 with his wife; a pilot for 39 years, he introduced a future
 commander of the Air Force One program to flying; he enjoyed playing
 guitar and learning about history, geography, and archeology; above
 all, he was devoted to his family; he took his sons, Chad and Mark,
 on hunting and fishing trips and coached basketball when they were
 young; in later years, he delighted in spending time with his
 grandchildren and cheering them on at their athletic events and
 dance recitals; and
 WHEREAS, Admired for his kindness, patience, and dedication,
 Ed Auler lived a caring and purposeful life, and he will be
 remembered with admiration and affection by all who were privileged
 to know him; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 88th Legislature of the State of Texas,
 3rd Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the life of Hugo Edwin
 Auler and extend sincere condolences to the members of his family:
 to his wife, Susan Auler; to his children, Chad Auler and his wife,
 Stacy, and Mark Auler and his wife, Clary; to his grandchildren,
 Yates, Charles, Ash, Daisy, and Shelby Auler; to his sister, Mary
 Ann Meyers; and to his other relatives and many friends; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Ed Auler.
 Craddick
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 27 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on November 1, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 27 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on November 5, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor