Texas 2023 88th 3rd C.S.

Texas House Bill HR51 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 11/02/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.R. No. 51


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, All who shared in the life of William Murphey Black
 Sr. of Ozona were deeply saddened by his passing on August 7, 2023,
 at the age of 83; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Charles Sewell Black Jr. and Mary Jane
 Murphey Black, Bill Black was born in Big Lake on April 22, 1940,
 and he grew up on his family's ranch with the companionship of his
 sister, Judy; he graduated from Ozona High School in 1958 and
 attended Texas Christian University, where he enrolled in the ranch
 management program; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Black married Susie Chandler on March 31, 1961,
 and the couple shared a fulfilling union that spanned 62 years; they
 became the proud parents of two children, Will and Sue Ellen, who
 preceded her father in death, and their family eventually grew to
 include five grandchildren, Murphey, Allie, Weslee, Wendy, and
 Whitney, and four great-grandchildren, Brit, Bodie, Maddie, and
 Maysen; and
 WHEREAS, A lifelong rancher, Mr. Black worked livestock in
 Crockett, Pecos, Terrell, and Val Verde Counties, and for several
 years, he bought and sold sheep and goats from ranchers in the area
 and sent them all over the United States; in addition to ranching,
 he owned and operated Ozona Storage and Encino RV Park with his
 wife; and
 WHEREAS, Active in his community, Mr. Black served as
 Crockett County commissioner for six years, and he gave generously
 of his time and talents to the Texas Sheep and Goat Raisers
 Association, the American Sheep Industry Association, and the Texas
 and Southwestern Cattle Raisers Association; he was one of the
 original directors of the Crockett National Bank and a valued
 member of Ozona United Methodist Church; known for his tremendous
 work ethic and wonderful sense of humor, he enjoyed sharing stories
 and good conversation with friends, loved ones, and strangers
 alike, and in his younger years, he took pleasure in hunting,
 fishing, and team roping; and
 WHEREAS, Although Bill Black is greatly missed, he has left
 his family and friends with a wealth of memories that they will
 forever treasure; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature, 3rd Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the life of
 William Murphey Black Sr. and extend sincere condolences to all who
 mourn his passing; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Bill Black.
 Murr
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 51 was unanimously adopted by a rising
 vote of the House on November 1, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House