Texas 2023 88th 3rd C.S.

Texas House Bill HR55 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 11/02/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.R. No. 55


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A full and generous life drew to a close with the
 passing of the Honorable Peggy Diane Ragsdale of Mason on
 September 3, 2023, at the age of 71; and
 WHEREAS, The daughter of Bill Ira and Sara Lee Smith, the
 former Peggy Smith was born in Mason on October 22, 1951, and she
 grew up with the companionship of three brothers, Terry, Ronnie,
 and Rick; she enjoyed a long and rewarding career as justice of the
 peace for Kimble County until her retirement; and
 WHEREAS, She married Billy Lee "Dooker" Ragsdale in Junction
 on January 9, 1981, and the couple shared many happy years together
 before his passing; Mrs. Ragsdale took great pride in her sons,
 Michael and Robert Darnell, and her family eventually grew to
 include nine grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, While the death of Peggy Ragsdale brings
 immeasurable sorrow to her family and friends, she leaves behind a
 record of service that will long be treasured by all those who held
 her dear; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature, 3rd Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the memory
 of Peggy Diane Ragsdale and extend heartfelt sympathy to the
 members of her family: to her sons, Michael and Robert Darnell; to
 her brother, Rick Smith, and his wife, Debra; to her grandchildren;
 and to her other relatives and many friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Peggy
 Ragsdale.
 Murr
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 55 was unanimously adopted by a rising
 vote of the House on November 1, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House