Texas 2023 88th 4th C.S.

Texas House Bill HR30 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 11/17/2023

                    H.R. No. 30


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, May 2, 2023, marked the 100th anniversary of the
 death of Lee J. Rountree, who rendered exceptional service to
 Bryan, Brazos, and Grimes Counties as a member of the Texas House of
 Representatives from 1921 to 1923; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Hays County on July 15, 1868, Leonidas
 Johnson "Lee J." Rountree was the grandson of Alabama state senator
 the Reverend Samuel Johnson; at the age of 11, he went to work at his
 stepfather's newspaper business, and he later took over its
 operation alongside his mother; he operated and acquired several
 other publications in Georgetown and Sulphur Springs over the
 course of his career, and he distinguished himself further by
 serving as president of the National Editorial Association and as
 secretary of the Southwest Press Association; he was also president
 of the Hose, Hook and Ladder Company of Kyle; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Rountree served as a representative at a number
 of political conventions, and he was appointed as the tax
 assessor-collector for Kyle in 1890, at the age of 21; he moved to
 Bryan in 1920 and purchased a controlling interest in the Bryan
 Eagle, becoming the publication's managing editor; that same year,
 he made a successful bid for a seat in the House of Representatives,
 and he went on to run for reelection unopposed in 1922; and
 WHEREAS, During his two terms of service, Representative
 Rountree worked diligently for the good of his constituents; he
 chaired the Conservation and Reclamation Committee and made further
 contributions to committees on appropriations, taxation, and other
 issues; he passed away while on the House floor on May 2, 1923, and
 was buried in Bryan two days later; his widow, Frances Rountree, was
 appointed to serve out his final term, and she later became the
 first woman elected to represent Brazos County in the state
 legislature, holding that office from 1931 to 1932; and
 WHEREAS, Lee Rountree made a positive impact in the lives of
 many Texans through his legislative and professional achievements,
 and a century after his passing, he remains a source of great pride
 to the community he faithfully served; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature, 4th Called Session, hereby commemorate the 100th
 anniversary of the death of the Honorable Lee J. Rountree and pay
 tribute to his life and legacy.
 Schofield
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 30 was adopted by the House on
 November 17, 2023, by a non-record vote.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House