LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Committees
Local & Consent Calendars
Bills & Legislation
TX
House Local & Consent Calendars Committee
Overview
Committee Members
Legislative Activity
Bills & Legislation
Calendar
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
House Local & Consent Calendars Committee
Bills & Legislation
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR59
Recognizing Jos D. Ollervides for his service to the City of Laredo.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR58
Recognizing March 2025 as Kidney Month.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR61
Congratulating UTMB in Galveston on its recognition as a 2025 High Performing Hospital for Maternity Care by U.S. News & World Report.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR65
Recognizing February 26, 2025, as Bee County Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR62
Recognizing March 5, 2025, as Kleberg County Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR63
Recognizing March 6, 2025, as Jim Wells County Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR64
Recognizing March 20, 2025, as Calhoun County Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR66
In memory of Anthony Dale Dunn of Killeen.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR67
Recognizing March 19, 2025, as San Patricio County Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HCR43
Congratulating Jack D. Hightower on his induction into the Petroleum Hall of Fame.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR329
Recognizing February 26, 2025, as Plano Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR330
Recognizing March 5, 2025, as IMPACT Pasadena Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR331
Congratulating U.S. Army Brigadier General (Ret.) Joe E. Ramirez Jr. on his retirement as vice president for student affairs at Texas A&M University.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR332
In memory of George S. Cavazos Sr. of Cameron County.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR335
Recognizing February 25 and 26, 2025, as Plano Legislative Days at the State Capitol.
Page 1 of 58
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10