Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

House Local & Consent Calendars Committee Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HR431

In memory of Deputy Fernando Esqueda of the Harris County Sheriff's Office.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HR413

Congratulating Brandi Clausen of the Dalhart VFD on being named 2024 Firefighter of the Year by the Panhandle Firemen's and Fire Marshals' Association.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HR414

Congratulating Sarah Hininger of the Dalhart VFD on being named the 2024 EMS Responder of the Year by the Panhandle Firemen's and Fire Marshals' Association.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HR504

Congratulating the Texas Rangers on their 53rd anniversary in Arlington.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HR502

Recognizing March 13, 2025, as Nepalese Day at the Texas State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HR500

Recognizing March 21, 2025, as World Down Syndrome Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HR505

Recognizing March 20, 2025, as De Leon ISD Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HR506

Commemorating the grand opening of the John Ashman Fire Training Complex in Lewisville.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HR507

Congratulating Sergeant Barron Smith on his retirement from the Flower Mound Police Department.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HR555

Honoring the Adopt A Highway Maintenance Corporation for its 10 years of dedicated service to the State of Texas.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HR556

In memory of Jacob Creth "Jake" Fuller of McAllen.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HR557

Recognizing Julio's Seasoning & Corn Chips in Del Rio.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HR551

Recognizing March 25, 2025, as Johnson County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HR440

Commemorating the 30th anniversary of Methodist Healthcare Ministries of South Texas.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HR386

Recognizing February 26, 2025, as Green Light Houston Day at the State Capitol.