Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB117 Fiscal Note / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/06/2025

                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD     Austin, Texas       FISCAL NOTE, 89TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION             April 6, 2025       TO: Honorable Brad Buckley, Chair, House Committee on Public Education     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB117 by Schoolcraft (relating to the establishment of the governor s task force on the governance of early childhood education and care.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted     Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB117, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted: a negative impact of ($2,154,136) through the biennium ending August 31, 2027. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact toGeneral Revenue Related Funds2026($788,174)2027($1,365,962)2028$02029$02030$0All Funds, Five-Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1 Change in Number of State Employees from FY 20252026($788,174)1.02027($1,365,962)1.02028$00.02029$00.02030$00.0 Fiscal AnalysisThe bill would establish the governor's task force on the governance of early childhood education and care. The task force would be administratively attached to the Texas Education Agency (TEA).The task force would conduct a comprehensive review of the existing functions and responsibilities of the Health and Human Services Commission, TEA, and the Texas Workforce Commission related to early childhood education and care. The task force would also require those agencies to complete and submit to the task force periodic progress reports and to refine statewide goals and strategic plans.The bill would require TEA, from money appropriated or otherwise available, to pay the costs of data system integration, research, and administration for the task force.The bill would require the task force to develop and submit a report to the legislature, not later than December 1, 2026, that would include budget and policy recommendations to improve early childhood education and care governance in certain ways.The task force would be abolished September 1, 2027.

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 89TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 6, 2025

 

 

  TO: Honorable Brad Buckley, Chair, House Committee on Public Education     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB117 by Schoolcraft (relating to the establishment of the governor s task force on the governance of early childhood education and care.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted   

TO: Honorable Brad Buckley, Chair, House Committee on Public Education
FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB117 by Schoolcraft (relating to the establishment of the governor s task force on the governance of early childhood education and care.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable Brad Buckley, Chair, House Committee on Public Education

 Honorable Brad Buckley, Chair, House Committee on Public Education

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 HB117 by Schoolcraft (relating to the establishment of the governor s task force on the governance of early childhood education and care.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted 

 HB117 by Schoolcraft (relating to the establishment of the governor s task force on the governance of early childhood education and care.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted 



Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB117, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted: a negative impact of ($2,154,136) through the biennium ending August 31, 2027. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB117, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted: a negative impact of ($2,154,136) through the biennium ending August 31, 2027. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: 


2026 ($788,174)
2027 ($1,365,962)
2028 $0
2029 $0
2030 $0

All Funds, Five-Year Impact: 


2026 ($788,174) 1.0
2027 ($1,365,962) 1.0
2028 $0 0.0
2029 $0 0.0
2030 $0 0.0

 Fiscal Analysis

The bill would establish the governor's task force on the governance of early childhood education and care. The task force would be administratively attached to the Texas Education Agency (TEA).The task force would conduct a comprehensive review of the existing functions and responsibilities of the Health and Human Services Commission, TEA, and the Texas Workforce Commission related to early childhood education and care. The task force would also require those agencies to complete and submit to the task force periodic progress reports and to refine statewide goals and strategic plans.The bill would require TEA, from money appropriated or otherwise available, to pay the costs of data system integration, research, and administration for the task force.The bill would require the task force to develop and submit a report to the legislature, not later than December 1, 2026, that would include budget and policy recommendations to improve early childhood education and care governance in certain ways.The task force would be abolished September 1, 2027.

 Methodology

TEA estimates committee costs would be $53,040 in fiscal year 2026 and $26,520 in fiscal year 2027.The analysis assumes TEA would require 1.0 FTE to implement the provisions of this bill at a cost of $0.3 million for the biennium.TEA estimates the cost to produce the periodic agency reports and the report to the Legislature would be $125,000 in both fiscal years 2026 and 2027.This analysis assumes costs to other state agencies could be absorbed with existing resources.

 Technology

TEA assumes IT costs to implement the provisions of the bill would total $1.5 million for the biennium. 

 Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: b > td > 300 Trusteed Programs Within the Office of the Governor, 320 Texas Workforce Commission, 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 537 State Health Services, Department of, 701 Texas Education Agency

300 Trusteed Programs Within the Office of the Governor, 320 Texas Workforce Commission, 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 537 State Health Services, Department of, 701 Texas Education Agency

LBB Staff: b > td > JMc, JPE, ASA, ENA

JMc, JPE, ASA, ENA