Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1544 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/15/2025

                    89R4696 CS-D
 By: Raymond, Vasut, Little, Goodwin, Muñoz H.B. No. 1544




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the recovery by this state from the federal government
 of certain border security expenditures.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 403, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 403.0123 to read as follows:
 Sec. 403.0123.  RECOVERY OF CERTAIN BORDER SECURITY
 EXPENDITURES. (a) The comptroller shall, not later than the 30th
 day after the beginning of each state fiscal biennium:
 (1)  determine the amount of money spent by this state
 on border security during the preceding state fiscal biennium;
 (2)  prepare an invoice requesting payment of the
 amount determined under Subdivision (1); and
 (3)  submit the invoice prepared under Subdivision (2)
 to the appropriate agency of the federal government for payment.
 (b)  The comptroller may request the assistance of the
 Legislative Budget Board in making the determination required under
 Subsection (a)(1), and the Legislative Budget Board shall provide
 the requested assistance.
 (c)  An invoice submitted under Subsection (a)(3) must
 include the date the invoice is due, which must be at least six, but
 not more than eight, months after the date the invoice is submitted.
 (d)  If an invoice submitted under Subsection (a)(3) is paid
 on or before the date the invoice is due, the comptroller shall
 deposit the payment in the state treasury to the credit of the
 general revenue fund.
 (e)  If an invoice submitted under Subsection (a)(3) is not
 timely paid, the comptroller shall certify the amount due as stated
 on the invoice to the attorney general, who shall bring an action
 against the appropriate agency of the federal government to recover
 the amount due as certified by the comptroller.
 (f)  The comptroller shall deposit any money received as a
 result of an action brought under Subsection (e) in the state
 treasury to the credit of the general revenue fund.
 (g)  Notwithstanding any provision of Subsection (a) to the
 contrary, for the state fiscal biennium ending August 31, 2025:
 (1)  the comptroller shall take the actions described
 by Subsection (a) not later than March 1, 2026; and
 (2)  for purposes of Subsection (a)(1), the comptroller
 shall determine the amount of money spent by this state on border
 security to be the lesser of:
 (A)  the amount of money spent by this state for
 that purpose during the period beginning September 1, 2001, and
 ending August 31, 2025; or
 (B)  $20 billion.
 (h)  Subsection (g) and this subsection expire August 31,
 2027.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.