Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1545 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/14/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    89R10570 BCH-D
 By: Bell of Kaufman H.B. No. 1545




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the sunset review process and certain governmental
 entities subject to that process.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 ARTICLE 1.  ENTITIES GIVEN 2031 SUNSET DATE
 SECTION 1.01.  CREDIT UNION DEPARTMENT. Section 15.212,
 Finance Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 15.212.  SUNSET PROVISION. The Credit Union Department
 and the Credit Union Commission are subject to Chapter 325,
 Government Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence
 as provided by that chapter, the department and commission are
 abolished September 1, 2031 [2035].
 SECTION 1.02.  STATE OFFICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE HEARINGS.
 Section 2003.023, Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 2003.023.  SUNSET PROVISION.  The State Office of
 Administrative Hearings is subject to review under Chapter 325
 (Texas Sunset Act), but is not abolished under that chapter.  The
 office shall be reviewed during the periods in which state agencies
 abolished in 2031 [2027] and every 12th year after 2031 [2027] are
 reviewed.
 SECTION 1.03.  TEXAS JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT. (a)
 Section 202.010, Human Resources Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 202.010.  SUNSET PROVISION. The Texas Juvenile Justice
 Board and the Texas Juvenile Justice Department are subject to
 Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act).  Unless continued
 in existence as provided by that chapter, the board and the
 department are abolished September 1, 2031 [2027].
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 202.010, Human Resources Code,
 as amended by this Act, the Sunset Advisory Commission shall
 conduct a limited-scope review of the Texas Juvenile Justice
 Department for the 90th Legislature.
 (c)  In conducting the limited-scope review under this
 section, the Sunset Advisory Commission staff evaluation and report
 must be limited to assessing the Texas Juvenile Justice
 Department's administration of its regionalization duties aimed at
 prioritizing the use of local levels of the juvenile justice system
 over placement or commitment to secure facilities operated by the
 Texas Juvenile Justice Department.
 (d)  The Sunset Advisory Commission may not review the office
 of independent ombudsman of the Texas Juvenile Justice Department
 as part of the limited-scope review conducted under this section.
 (e)  The Sunset Advisory Commission's recommendations to the
 90th Legislature may include any recommendation the commission
 considers appropriate based on the limited-scope review conducted
 under this section.
 (f)  The Texas Juvenile Justice Department shall submit a
 report not later than September 1, 2026, to the Sunset Advisory
 Commission, the speaker of the house of representatives, the
 lieutenant governor, and the standing committees of each house of
 the legislature with primary jurisdiction over juvenile justice
 that includes information about:
 (1)  the status of the United States Department of
 Justice's investigation into the Texas Juvenile Justice Department
 and the Texas Juvenile Justice Department's progress in addressing
 findings as detailed in the United States Department of Justice's
 report titled "Investigation of the Texas Juvenile Justice
 Department," published on August 1, 2024;
 (2)  the waitlist of youth committed to the Texas
 Juvenile Justice Department awaiting transfer to state secure
 facilities from county facilities;
 (3)  the Texas Juvenile Justice Department's staffing
 and turnover at state facilities for each fiscal year since fiscal
 year 2016; and
 (4)  the progress on construction of additional state
 juvenile correctional facilities for which the legislature
 appropriated funding in the 2024-2025 biennium.
 ARTICLE 2.  ENTITIES GIVEN 2033 SUNSET DATE
 SECTION 2.01.  STATE BOARD OF VETERINARY MEDICAL EXAMINERS.
 Section 801.003, Occupations Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 801.003.  APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT.  The State Board of
 Veterinary Medical Examiners is subject to Chapter 325, Government
 Code (Texas Sunset Act).  Unless continued in existence as provided
 by that chapter, the board is abolished September 1, 2033 [2027].
 ARTICLE 3.  ENTITIES GIVEN 2035 SUNSET DATE
 SECTION 3.01.  STATE SOIL AND WATER CONSERVATION BOARD.
 Section 12, Chapter 358 (S.B. 1424), Acts of the 88th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2023, is repealed.
 ARTICLE 4.  AMENDMENTS TO THE TEXAS SUNSET ACT
 SECTION 4.01.  SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION. Section
 325.003(a-1), Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a-1)  A public member acts on behalf of the legislature when
 participating on the commission in furtherance of the legislature's
 duty to provide oversight of state [executive branch] agencies'
 implementation of legislative priorities.
 SECTION 4.02.  AGENCY REPORT TO COMMISSION. Section
 325.007(a), Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Before September 1 of the odd-numbered year before the
 year in which a state agency subject to this chapter is abolished or
 reviewed, the agency shall report to the commission:
 (1)  information regarding the application to the
 agency of the criteria in Section 325.011; and
 (2)  any other information that the agency considers
 appropriate or that is requested by the commission.
 SECTION 4.03.  REPORTING REQUIREMENTS OF AGENCY BEING
 REVIEWED. Section 325.0075, Government Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 325.0075.  REPORTING REQUIREMENTS OF AGENCY BEING
 REVIEWED.  Before September 1 of the odd-numbered year before the
 year in which a state agency subject to this chapter is abolished or
 reviewed, the agency shall submit to the commission, the governor,
 the lieutenant governor, and each member of the legislature a
 report that:
 (1)  lists each report that the agency is required by a
 statute to prepare; and
 (2)  evaluates the need for each report listed in
 Subdivision (1) based on whether factors or conditions have changed
 since the date the statutory requirement to prepare the report was
 enacted.
 SECTION 4.04.  COMMISSION DUTIES. Section 325.008(a),
 Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Before January 1 of the year in which a state agency
 subject to this chapter and its advisory committees are abolished
 or reviewed, the commission shall:
 (1)  review and take action necessary to verify the
 reports submitted by the agency under Section 325.007;
 (2)  consult the Legislative Budget Board, the
 Governor's Budget, Policy, and Planning Division, the State
 Auditor, and the comptroller of public accounts, or their
 successors, on the application to the agency of the criteria
 provided in Section 325.011;
 (3)  conduct a review of the agency based on the
 criteria provided in Section 325.011 and prepare a written report;
 and
 (4)  review the implementation of commission
 recommendations contained in the reports presented to the
 legislature during the preceding legislative session and the
 resulting legislation.
 SECTION 4.05.  PUBLIC HEARINGS. Section 325.009(a),
 Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Before February 1 of the year a state agency subject to
 this chapter and its advisory committees are abolished or reviewed,
 the commission shall conduct public hearings concerning but not
 limited to the application to the agency of the criteria provided in
 Section 325.011.
 SECTION 4.06.  REVIEW OF CERTAIN AGENCIES. Sections
 325.0125(a) and (b), Government Code, are amended to read as
 follows:
 (a)  In the two-year period preceding the date scheduled for
 the abolition or review of a state agency under this chapter, the
 commission may exempt certain agencies from the requirements of
 this chapter relating to staff reports, hearings, and reviews.
 (b)  The commission may only exempt agencies that have been
 inactive for a period of two years preceding the date the agency is
 scheduled for abolition or review, that have been rendered inactive
 by an action of the legislature, or that the commission determines
 are unable to participate in the review due to a declared disaster.
 ARTICLE 5.  EFFECTIVE DATE
 SECTION 5.01.  EFFECTIVE DATE.  This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2025.