Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2142 Fiscal Note / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/14/2025

                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD     Austin, Texas       FISCAL NOTE, 89TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION             April 14, 2025       TO: Honorable Cecil Bell, Chair, House Committee on Intergovernmental Affairs     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB2142 by Simmons (Relating to a study by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs on the feasibility of using certain models to address homelessness in this state.), As Introduced     Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2142, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($371,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2027. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact toGeneral Revenue Related Funds2026($371,000)2027$02028$02029$02030$0All Funds, Five-Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund12026($371,000)2027$02028$02029$02030$0 Fiscal AnalysisThe bill would require the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs (TDHCA) to conduct a a study on the feasibility of models aimed at addressing homelessness in Texas. TDHCA would be required to submit a report detailing the study results and recommendations to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, and the Legislature by December 31, 2026.This bill would take effect on September 1, 2025 and expire on September 1, 2027.

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 89TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 14, 2025



TO: Honorable Cecil Bell, Chair, House Committee on Intergovernmental Affairs     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB2142 by Simmons (Relating to a study by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs on the feasibility of using certain models to address homelessness in this state.), As Introduced

TO: Honorable Cecil Bell, Chair, House Committee on Intergovernmental Affairs
FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2142 by Simmons (Relating to a study by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs on the feasibility of using certain models to address homelessness in this state.), As Introduced



Honorable Cecil Bell, Chair, House Committee on Intergovernmental Affairs

Honorable Cecil Bell, Chair, House Committee on Intergovernmental Affairs

Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board

Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2142 by Simmons (Relating to a study by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs on the feasibility of using certain models to address homelessness in this state.), As Introduced

HB2142 by Simmons (Relating to a study by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs on the feasibility of using certain models to address homelessness in this state.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2142, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($371,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2027. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2142, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($371,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2027. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact:


2026 ($371,000)
2027 $0
2028 $0
2029 $0
2030 $0



All Funds, Five-Year Impact:


2026 ($371,000)
2027 $0
2028 $0
2029 $0
2030 $0



Fiscal Analysis

The bill would require the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs (TDHCA) to conduct a a study on the feasibility of models aimed at addressing homelessness in Texas. TDHCA would be required to submit a report detailing the study results and recommendations to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, and the Legislature by December 31, 2026.This bill would take effect on September 1, 2025 and expire on September 1, 2027.

This bill would take effect on September 1, 2025 and expire on September 1, 2027.

Methodology

Based on analysis by TDHCA, the agency would need to contract with a third party to undertake the required study. Based on actual costs incurred for similar studies outsourced by TDHCA in the past, procuring the services of a third party to conduct a study of the scope the bill would require would cost a minimum of $371,000. TDHCA would contract with a third party and remit payment in fiscal year 2026, with no costs in subsequent fiscal years.

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: b > td > 332 Department of Housing and Community Affairs, 710 Texas A&M University System Administrative and General Offices, 717 Texas Southern University, 719 Texas State Technical College System Administration, 720 The University of Texas System Administration, 758 Texas State University System, 768 Texas Tech University System Administration, 769 University of North Texas System Administration, 783 University of Houston System Administration



332 Department of Housing and Community Affairs, 710 Texas A&M University System Administrative and General Offices, 717 Texas Southern University, 719 Texas State Technical College System Administration, 720 The University of Texas System Administration, 758 Texas State University System, 768 Texas Tech University System Administration, 769 University of North Texas System Administration, 783 University of Houston System Administration

LBB Staff: b > td > JMc, SZ, GDZ, DPE



JMc, SZ, GDZ, DPE