Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2186 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 01/28/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD     Austin, Texas       FISCAL NOTE, 89TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION             April 7, 2025       TO: Honorable Dade Phelan, Chair, House Committee on Licensing & Administrative Procedures     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB2186 by Hernandez (Relating to the regulation of elevator mechanics, elevator apprentices, and contractors; requiring an occupational registration.), As Introduced     Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2186, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2027. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact toGeneral Revenue Related Funds2026$02027$02028$02029$02030$0All Funds, Five-Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1 Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1 Change in Number of State Employees from FY 20252026($112,674)$112,6741.02027($200,956)$200,9562.02028($200,956)$200,9562.02029($200,956)$200,9562.02030($200,956)$200,9562.0 Fiscal AnalysisThe bill would amend the Health and Safety Code to include elevator mechanics and elevator apprentices as professions that must be registered with the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation (TDLR). Individuals would be prevented from doing any work on elevators, escalators, or related equipment until they are registered with TDLR. The bill would set requirements for registration and authorizes TDLR to adopt rules on the issuance of the registrations. The bill states that an individual is not required to be registered with TDLR as an elevator mechanic or apprentice until November 1, 2026. The bill would take effect September 1, 2025.

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 89TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 7, 2025



TO: Honorable Dade Phelan, Chair, House Committee on Licensing & Administrative Procedures     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB2186 by Hernandez (Relating to the regulation of elevator mechanics, elevator apprentices, and contractors; requiring an occupational registration.), As Introduced

TO: Honorable Dade Phelan, Chair, House Committee on Licensing & Administrative Procedures
FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2186 by Hernandez (Relating to the regulation of elevator mechanics, elevator apprentices, and contractors; requiring an occupational registration.), As Introduced



Honorable Dade Phelan, Chair, House Committee on Licensing & Administrative Procedures

Honorable Dade Phelan, Chair, House Committee on Licensing & Administrative Procedures

Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board

Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2186 by Hernandez (Relating to the regulation of elevator mechanics, elevator apprentices, and contractors; requiring an occupational registration.), As Introduced

HB2186 by Hernandez (Relating to the regulation of elevator mechanics, elevator apprentices, and contractors; requiring an occupational registration.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2186, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2027. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2186, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2027. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact:


2026 $0
2027 $0
2028 $0
2029 $0
2030 $0



All Funds, Five-Year Impact:


2026 ($112,674) $112,674 1.0
2027 ($200,956) $200,956 2.0
2028 ($200,956) $200,956 2.0
2029 ($200,956) $200,956 2.0
2030 ($200,956) $200,956 2.0



Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend the Health and Safety Code to include elevator mechanics and elevator apprentices as professions that must be registered with the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation (TDLR). Individuals would be prevented from doing any work on elevators, escalators, or related equipment until they are registered with TDLR. The bill would set requirements for registration and authorizes TDLR to adopt rules on the issuance of the registrations. The bill states that an individual is not required to be registered with TDLR as an elevator mechanic or apprentice until November 1, 2026. The bill would take effect September 1, 2025.

The bill would take effect September 1, 2025.

Methodology

Based upon analysis provided by TDLR, this estimate assumes that the agency will require 1.0 additional Programmer ($100,618 each year with $30,104 in estimated benefits) full-time equivalent position (FTE) to make the necessary changes to the licensing system and 1.0 additional License and Permit Specialist FTE ($46,000 each year with $13,763 in estimated benefits) to review and process the additional applications. This estimate assumes an additional $10,470 in annual operating expenses related to the additional staff and an additional $12,196 in fiscal year 2026 for one-time costs related to the onboarding of the new staff. As individuals would not be required to register until November 1, 2026, the agency would not hire these additional staff until halfway through fiscal year 2026, resulting in reduced costs in that fiscal year. Pursuant to the Texas Occupations Code, Section 51.202, TDLR is required to generate sufficient revenues to cover the cost of agency appropriations and the other direct and indirect costs appropriated to other state agencies. This estimate assumes that the agency would be required to collect fee-generated revenue from the new registrants to cover the costs associated with implementing the bill's provisions. Based upon population projections provided by TDLR and the Comptroller of Public Accounts, the fee for initial and renewed registration would be $70 for elevator mechanics and $42 for elevator apprentices. This estimate assumes that with an estimated participating population of 1,600 elevator mechanics in fiscal year 2026, and that an estimated 2,555 mechanics and 518 apprentices apply in fiscal year 2027 onward, there is sufficient revenue to cover the costs of implementing the provisions of the bill.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: b > td > 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 452 Department of Licensing and Regulation



304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 452 Department of Licensing and Regulation

LBB Staff: b > td > JMc, TUf, GDZ, BFa



JMc, TUf, GDZ, BFa