Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2188 House Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 05/07/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD     Austin, Texas       FISCAL NOTE, 89TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION             May 4, 2025       TO: Honorable Gary VanDeaver, Chair, House Committee on Public Health     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB2188 by Howard (relating to the transition of the nurse aide certification program from the Health and Human Services Commission to the Texas Board of Nursing and to the creation of a workgroup on nursing career pathways and a panel on nursing program standards.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted     Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2188, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted: a negative impact of ($30,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2027. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact toGeneral Revenue Related Funds2026($20,000)2027($10,000)2028$02029$02030$0All Funds, Five-Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund12026($20,000)2027($10,000)2028$02029$02030$0 Fiscal AnalysisThe bill would direct the Board of Nursing to oversee a gold ribbon panel to review and examine the current nursing program standards and educational and other accreditation requirements, including assisting the panel in conducting at least three public hearings. The bill would take effect on September 1, 2025 and expire on January 1, 2027.

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 89TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 4, 2025



TO: Honorable Gary VanDeaver, Chair, House Committee on Public Health     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB2188 by Howard (relating to the transition of the nurse aide certification program from the Health and Human Services Commission to the Texas Board of Nursing and to the creation of a workgroup on nursing career pathways and a panel on nursing program standards.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

TO: Honorable Gary VanDeaver, Chair, House Committee on Public Health
FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2188 by Howard (relating to the transition of the nurse aide certification program from the Health and Human Services Commission to the Texas Board of Nursing and to the creation of a workgroup on nursing career pathways and a panel on nursing program standards.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted



Honorable Gary VanDeaver, Chair, House Committee on Public Health

Honorable Gary VanDeaver, Chair, House Committee on Public Health

Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board

Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2188 by Howard (relating to the transition of the nurse aide certification program from the Health and Human Services Commission to the Texas Board of Nursing and to the creation of a workgroup on nursing career pathways and a panel on nursing program standards.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

HB2188 by Howard (relating to the transition of the nurse aide certification program from the Health and Human Services Commission to the Texas Board of Nursing and to the creation of a workgroup on nursing career pathways and a panel on nursing program standards.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2188, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted: a negative impact of ($30,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2027. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2188, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted: a negative impact of ($30,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2027. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact:


2026 ($20,000)
2027 ($10,000)
2028 $0
2029 $0
2030 $0



All Funds, Five-Year Impact:


2026 ($20,000)
2027 ($10,000)
2028 $0
2029 $0
2030 $0



Fiscal Analysis

The bill would direct the Board of Nursing to oversee a gold ribbon panel to review and examine the current nursing program standards and educational and other accreditation requirements, including assisting the panel in conducting at least three public hearings. The bill would take effect on September 1, 2025 and expire on January 1, 2027.

The bill would take effect on September 1, 2025 and expire on January 1, 2027.

Methodology

According to analysis by the Board of Nursing, the agency would require $20,000 in fiscal year 2026 and $10,000 in fiscal year 2027 to reimburse the panel's travel expenses for the three required public meetings.

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: b > td > 507 Texas Board of Nursing, 537 State Health Services, Department of, 781 Higher Education Coordinating Board



507 Texas Board of Nursing, 537 State Health Services, Department of, 781 Higher Education Coordinating Board

LBB Staff: b > td > JMc, NPe, GDZ, DPE



JMc, NPe, GDZ, DPE