Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2284 Fiscal Note / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/20/2025

                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD     Austin, Texas       FISCAL NOTE, 89TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION             April 20, 2025       TO: Honorable Gary VanDeaver, Chair, House Committee on Public Health     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB2284 by Johnson (Relating to the licensing and regulation of music therapists; requiring an occupational license; authorizing fees.), As Introduced     Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2284, As Introduced: a positive impact of $144,000 through the biennium ending August 31, 2027. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact toGeneral Revenue Related Funds2026$75,0002027$69,0002028$72,0002029$72,0002030$72,000All Funds, Five-Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Revenue Gain fromGeneral Revenue Fund12026$75,0002027$69,0002028$72,0002029$72,0002030$72,000 Fiscal AnalysisThe bill would amend the Occupation Code to require a license to practice music therapy within the state. The Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation (TDLR) would be required to issue music therapist licenses to certain persons who meet the requirements of this chapter, adopt and enforce rules to administer the chapter and set fees to cover the cost of administering the chapter. A music therapist license would be valid for two years and could be renewed by rules adopted by the commission. The bill would take effect September 1, 2025. Enforcement authority by TDLR and the requirement to be licensed would take effect September 1, 2026.

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 89TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 20, 2025



TO: Honorable Gary VanDeaver, Chair, House Committee on Public Health     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB2284 by Johnson (Relating to the licensing and regulation of music therapists; requiring an occupational license; authorizing fees.), As Introduced

TO: Honorable Gary VanDeaver, Chair, House Committee on Public Health
FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2284 by Johnson (Relating to the licensing and regulation of music therapists; requiring an occupational license; authorizing fees.), As Introduced



Honorable Gary VanDeaver, Chair, House Committee on Public Health

Honorable Gary VanDeaver, Chair, House Committee on Public Health

Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board

Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2284 by Johnson (Relating to the licensing and regulation of music therapists; requiring an occupational license; authorizing fees.), As Introduced

HB2284 by Johnson (Relating to the licensing and regulation of music therapists; requiring an occupational license; authorizing fees.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2284, As Introduced: a positive impact of $144,000 through the biennium ending August 31, 2027. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2284, As Introduced: a positive impact of $144,000 through the biennium ending August 31, 2027. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact:


2026 $75,000
2027 $69,000
2028 $72,000
2029 $72,000
2030 $72,000



All Funds, Five-Year Impact:


2026 $75,000
2027 $69,000
2028 $72,000
2029 $72,000
2030 $72,000



Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend the Occupation Code to require a license to practice music therapy within the state. The Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation (TDLR) would be required to issue music therapist licenses to certain persons who meet the requirements of this chapter, adopt and enforce rules to administer the chapter and set fees to cover the cost of administering the chapter. A music therapist license would be valid for two years and could be renewed by rules adopted by the commission. The bill would take effect September 1, 2025. Enforcement authority by TDLR and the requirement to be licensed would take effect September 1, 2026.

Methodology

Based upon analysis provided by TDLR and the Comptroller of Public Accounts, there are approximately 960 music therapists who could initially be licensed under the provisions of the bill. TDLR would start accepting applications for initial licenses beginning in the summer of fiscal year 2026 prior to the licensing requirement going into effect on September 1, 2026. The agency anticipates and this estimate assumes approximately 500 music therapists would apply in fiscal year 2026 with the remaining 460 music therapists applying for initial licenses in fiscal 2027. TDLR expects approximately 480 music therapists would apply for initial, or renewal licenses each subsequent fiscal year. This estimate assumes that TDLR would set the fee for initial and renewal licenses at $150.This estimate assumes that TDLR can address any additional responsibilities and duties required by the bill through utilizing existing resources.

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: b > td > 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 452 Department of Licensing and Regulation



304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 452 Department of Licensing and Regulation

LBB Staff: b > td > JMc, NPe, GDZ, BFa



JMc, NPe, GDZ, BFa