Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3037 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/19/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    89R11814 SRA-D
 By: Dutton H.B. No. 3037




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to temporarily decreasing the rate of state sales and use
 taxes under certain circumstances.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 151, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 151.0511 to read as follows:
 Sec. 151.0511.  TEMPORARY DECREASE IN TAX RATE; CONDITIONS.
 (a)  Using any available methods and revenue estimates, the
 comptroller shall:
 (1)  determine the amount of the ending certification
 balance for the state fiscal biennium ending August 31, 2025, that
 is attributable to revenue during that state fiscal biennium from
 the taxes imposed under this chapter;
 (2)  determine the amount, if any, of the estimated
 ending certification balance for the state fiscal biennium ending
 August 31, 2027, that is attributable to revenue during that state
 fiscal biennium from the taxes imposed under this chapter if those
 taxes are imposed at the tax rate provided by Section 151.051(b);
 and
 (3)  if the amount determined under Subdivision (2) is
 more than 50 percent of the amount determined under Subdivision
 (1):
 (A)  determine the tax rate that, when substituted
 for the tax rate described by Subdivision (2), results in the amount
 determined under Subdivision (2) equaling 50 percent of the amount
 determined under Subdivision (1); and
 (B)  publish the tax rate determined under
 Paragraph (A) in the Texas Register and on the comptroller's
 Internet website and provide notice of that tax rate to sales tax
 permit holders.
 (b)  If the condition provided by Subsection (a)(3) is
 satisfied, the rate of the sales tax and use tax under this chapter
 applicable in the state fiscal biennium ending August 31, 2027, is
 the rate determined under Subsection (a)(3)(A), notwithstanding
 Section 151.051(b).
 (c)  This section expires December 1, 2027.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.