89R8914 JDK-F By: Thompson H.B. No. 3536 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the Collaborative Task Force on Public School Mental Health Services. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 38.302, Education Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 38.302. ESTABLISHMENT. The Collaborative Task Force on Public School Mental Health Services is established to study and evaluate: (1) mental health services that are funded by this state and provided at a school district or open-enrollment charter school for purposes of Sections 37.115 and 38.351 directly to: (A) a student enrolled in the district or school; (B) a parent or family member of or person standing in parental relation to a student enrolled in the district or school; or (C) an employee of the district or school; (2) training provided to an educator employed by the district or school to provide the mental health services described by Subdivision (1); and (3) the impact the mental health services described by Subdivision (1) have on: (A) the number of violent incidents that occur at school districts or open-enrollment charter schools; (B) the suicide rate of the individuals who are provided the mental health services described by Subdivision (1); (C) the number of public school students referred to the Department of Family and Protective Services for investigation services and the reasons for those referrals; (D) the number of individuals who are transported from each school district or open-enrollment charter school for an emergency detention under Chapter 573, Health and Safety Code; [and] (E) the number of public school students referred to outside providers for mental health care, including outside counselors referred to in accordance with Section 38.010; and (F) fostering a positive school climate as defined by Section 38.351(d). SECTION 2. Subchapter F-1, Chapter 38, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 38.3031 to read as follows: Sec. 38.3031. TERMS; VACANCY. (a) Members of the task force serve staggered three-year terms. A member may serve more than one term. (b) A vacancy on the task force shall be filled in the same manner as the original placement or appointment, as applicable. SECTION 3. Section 38.308(a), Education Code, is amended to read as follows: (a) The task force shall: (1) gather data on: (A) the number of students enrolled in each school district and open-enrollment charter school; (B) the number of individuals to whom each school district or open-enrollment charter school provides the mental health services described by Section 38.302(1); (C) the number of individuals for whom each school district or open-enrollment charter school has the resources to provide the mental health services described by Section 38.302(1); (D) the number of individuals described by Paragraph (B) who are referred to an inpatient or outpatient mental health provider; (E) the number of individuals who are transported from each school district or open-enrollment charter school for an emergency detention under Chapter 573, Health and Safety Code; (F) the race, ethnicity, gender, special education status, educationally disadvantaged status, and geographic location of: (i) individuals who are provided the mental health services described by Section 38.302(1); (ii) individuals who are described by Paragraph (D); (iii) individuals who are described by Paragraph (E); (iv) individuals who are described by Paragraph (H); [and] (v) individuals who are described by Paragraph (I); (vi) individuals who are described by Paragraph (L)(ii); (vii) individuals who are described by Paragraph (M)(iii); and (viii) individuals who are described by Paragraph (N)(iii); (G) mental health services and trainings provided by: (i) school districts, at both the campus and district level; and (ii) open-enrollment charter schools; (H) the number of individuals who were placed in a disciplinary alternative education program or out-of-school suspension or expelled; (I) the number of threat assessments conducted under Section 37.115; [and] (J) the number of reports made from each school district or open-enrollment charter school by an employee of the district or school or by a school resource officer, to the Department of Family and Protective Services regarding an alleged incident of abuse or neglect; (K) the mental health supports and services offered directly to students by a school district or open-enrollment charter school through the systemic and coordinated multitiered support system for mental health under Section 37.115 and in accordance with Section 38.351; (L) the number of referrals to mental health supports and services offered directly to students by a school district or open-enrollment charter school through the systemic and coordinated multitiered support system for mental health under Section 37.115 and in accordance with Section 38.351, including: (i) the number of referrals resulting from a threat assessment; and (ii) the number of students who received the support or service to which the student was referred; (M) the number of referrals to a partner or community-based provider, including: (i) the number of referrals made to each provider; (ii) the number of referrals resulting from a threat assessment; and (iii) the number of students who received the support or service to which the student was referred; and (N) the number of referrals to a psychiatric hospital, acute care hospital, or emergency room to address acute mental health risks, including: (i) the number of referrals made to each provider; (ii) the number of referrals resulting from a threat assessment; and (iii) the number of students who received the support or service to which the student was referred; and (2) study, evaluate, and make recommendations regarding the mental health services described by Section 38.302(1), the training described by Section 38.302(2), and the impact of those mental health services, as described by Section 38.302(3), including addressing: (A) the outcomes and the effectiveness of the services and training provided, including the outcomes and effectiveness of the service and training providers and the programs under which services and training are provided, in: (i) improving student academic achievement and attendance; (ii) reducing student disciplinary proceedings, suspensions, placements in a disciplinary alternative education program, and expulsions; and (iii) delivering prevention and intervention services to promote early mental health skills, including: (a) building skills relating to managing emotions, establishing and maintaining positive relationships, and making responsible decisions; (b) preventing substance abuse; (c) preventing suicides; (d) adhering to the purpose of the relevant program services or training; (e) promoting trauma-informed practices; (f) promoting a positive school climate, as defined by Section 38.351(d), in the district or school; and (g) improving physical and emotional safety and well-being in the district or school and reducing violence in the district or school; (B) best practices for districts and schools in implementing the services or training in accordance with Sections 37.115 and 38.351, including best practices for: (i) funding for mental health services and training provided by a district or school; (ii) improving psychological safety; (iii) coordinating systemic and multitiered support systems that address school climate, as defined by Section 39.351(d), the social and emotional domain, and behavioral and mental health; (iv) increasing contract-based collaborative efforts or partnerships with local community programs, agencies, and providers; and (v) district or school and campus level policies and procedures related to referral pathways to increase access to mental health services; (C) disparities in the race, ethnicity, gender, special education status, and geographic location of individuals receiving the services; and (D) best practices to replicate the services or training for all districts and schools. SECTION 4. Section 38.312, Education Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 38.312. EXPIRATION. The task force is abolished and this subchapter expires December 1, 2031 [2025]. SECTION 5. As soon as practicable after the effective date of this Act, the members of the Collaborative Task Force on Public School Mental Health Services shall draw lots to determine which members serve a term expiring September 1, 2026, which members serve a term expiring September 1, 2027, and which members serve a term expiring September 1, 2028. The lots must be split into thirds or as near to thirds as possible. SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2025.