Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4491 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 05/05/2025

                    BILL ANALYSIS             H.B. 4491     By: Bell, Cecil     Intergovernmental Affairs     Committee Report (Unamended)             BACKGROUND AND PURPOSE    On July 4, 2026, the United States will celebrate the semiquincentennial anniversary of American Independence Day. Current law only permits Texans to purchase fireworks from June 24 until 11:59 p.m. on July 4. The bill author has informed the committee that, because July 4, 2026, falls on a Saturday, Texans would only be able to purchase fireworks for half of the weekend in accordance with state law. H.B. 4491 seeks to address this issue by lengthening the period that fireworks will available for purchase during the weekend that American Independence Day will be celebrated in 2026.        CRIMINAL JUSTICE IMPACT   It is the committee's opinion that this bill does not expressly create a criminal offense, increase the punishment for an existing criminal offense or category of offenses, or change the eligibility of a person for community supervision, parole, or mandatory supervision.       RULEMAKING AUTHORITY    It is the committee's opinion that this bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, department, agency, or institution.       ANALYSIS    H.B. 4491 amends the Occupations Code to authorize a retail fireworks permit holder to sell fireworks only to the public during the period beginning at 12:01 a.m. on July 5, 2026, and ending at 11:59 p.m. on July 5, 2026. This provision expires September 1, 2026.       EFFECTIVE DATE    September 1, 2025.

BILL ANALYSIS



# BILL ANALYSIS

H.B. 4491
By: Bell, Cecil
Intergovernmental Affairs
Committee Report (Unamended)



H.B. 4491

By: Bell, Cecil

Intergovernmental Affairs

Committee Report (Unamended)

BACKGROUND AND PURPOSE    On July 4, 2026, the United States will celebrate the semiquincentennial anniversary of American Independence Day. Current law only permits Texans to purchase fireworks from June 24 until 11:59 p.m. on July 4. The bill author has informed the committee that, because July 4, 2026, falls on a Saturday, Texans would only be able to purchase fireworks for half of the weekend in accordance with state law. H.B. 4491 seeks to address this issue by lengthening the period that fireworks will available for purchase during the weekend that American Independence Day will be celebrated in 2026.
CRIMINAL JUSTICE IMPACT   It is the committee's opinion that this bill does not expressly create a criminal offense, increase the punishment for an existing criminal offense or category of offenses, or change the eligibility of a person for community supervision, parole, or mandatory supervision.
RULEMAKING AUTHORITY    It is the committee's opinion that this bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, department, agency, or institution.
ANALYSIS    H.B. 4491 amends the Occupations Code to authorize a retail fireworks permit holder to sell fireworks only to the public during the period beginning at 12:01 a.m. on July 5, 2026, and ending at 11:59 p.m. on July 5, 2026. This provision expires September 1, 2026.
EFFECTIVE DATE    September 1, 2025.



BACKGROUND AND PURPOSE

On July 4, 2026, the United States will celebrate the semiquincentennial anniversary of American Independence Day. Current law only permits Texans to purchase fireworks from June 24 until 11:59 p.m. on July 4. The bill author has informed the committee that, because July 4, 2026, falls on a Saturday, Texans would only be able to purchase fireworks for half of the weekend in accordance with state law. H.B. 4491 seeks to address this issue by lengthening the period that fireworks will available for purchase during the weekend that American Independence Day will be celebrated in 2026.

CRIMINAL JUSTICE IMPACT

It is the committee's opinion that this bill does not expressly create a criminal offense, increase the punishment for an existing criminal offense or category of offenses, or change the eligibility of a person for community supervision, parole, or mandatory supervision.

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

It is the committee's opinion that this bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, department, agency, or institution.

ANALYSIS

H.B. 4491 amends the Occupations Code to authorize a retail fireworks permit holder to sell fireworks only to the public during the period beginning at 12:01 a.m. on July 5, 2026, and ending at 11:59 p.m. on July 5, 2026. This provision expires September 1, 2026.

EFFECTIVE DATE

September 1, 2025.