Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4945 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/13/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Ashby H.B. No. 4945




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study conducted by the Teacher Retirement System of
 Texas on the feasibility of offering alternative service retirement
 benefits to Texas A&M Forest Service wildland firefighters that are
 members of the retirement system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 825, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 825.1086 to read as follows:
 Section 825.1086.  STUDY AND REPORT ON ALTERNATIVE SERVICE
 RETIREMENT BENEFITS FOR CERTAIN WILDLAND FIREFIGHTERS.  (a)  The
 retirement system shall conduct a study on the feasibility of
 offering members who are Texas A&M Forest Service wildland
 firefighters alternative service retirement benefits under the
 system.
 (b)  In conducting the study, the retirement system shall
 assess the costs to and impact on the retirement system associated
 with offering members who are Texas A&M Forest Service wildland
 firefighters the following alternative service retirement
 benefits:
 (1)  a service retirement benefit under the existing
 benefit plan that that provides retirement eligibility within a new
 tier described as Hazardous Duty for:
 (A)  a member who is at least 55 years old and who
 has at least 10 years of service credit in the appropriate field;
 (B)  a member who is at any age and has 25 years of
 service; or
 (C)  a member has 20 years of service that will be
 actuarily reduced by 5% for every year that is under the normal
 requirements within this tier; and
 (2)  a service retirement benefit under the existing
 plan that provides retirement eligibility within a new tier
 described as Hazardous Duty-Administrative Support for:
 (A)  a member who has become vested and has spent
 entire employment up to date of being vested in a wildland
 firefighter role within the Texas A&M Forest Service; or
 (B)  a member who has transferred out of a primary
 wildland firefighter role to a support role within Texas A&M Forest
 Service after the date of being fully vested.
 (c)  The standard service annuity for a member who qualifies
 under Subsection (b) is an amount computed on the basis of the
 member's average annual compensation for the five years of service,
 whether or not consecutive, in which the member received the
 highest annual compensation, times the sum of the percentage factor
 used in the computation of a standard service retirement annuity
 under Section 824.203 plus 0.5 percent.  Members that transfer into
 Hazardous Duty-Administrative Support will be able to retain the
 reduced service age requirements but will only earn service by the
 normal age percentage factor, as described under Section 824.203.
 (d)  No later than March 1, 2026, the retirement system shall
 begin meeting with the Texas A&M Forest Service to determine:
 (1)  positions that will qualify for benefits outlined
 in Subsection (b) and the salaries of both existing and terminated
 employees that qualified beginning on September 1, 2009;
 (2)  the effectiveness of additional 0.5 percent to the
 percentage factor under Section 824.203 or an accrual rate that is
 feasible for a member to retire at reduced service age
 requirements, while maintaining the actuarial soundness of the
 pension fund;
 (3)  the additional percentage of salary contribution
 needed by both the employer and employee to sustain the additional
 tiers described by subsection (b) while maintaining actuarial
 soundness within the pension fund;
 (4)  the cost to cover the additional employer and
 employee contributions needed between September 1, 2009 to present
 day; and
 (5)  the cost and implications of benefits being
 extended to reduced retirement ages in subsection (b).
 (e)  No later than December 31, 2026, the retirement system
 shall prepare and submit a report that contains the findings of the
 study and the information submitted to the retirement system under
 Subsection (d).
 (f)  The Legislative Budget Board and the State Pension
 Review Board shall, as necessary:
 (1)  assist the retirement system in conducting the
 study; and
 (2)  provide the retirement system with any information
 needed to complete the report required under subsection (e).
 (g)  This section expires on September 1, 2027.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.