Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB5191 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/14/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    89R14137 RDR-F
 By: Smithee H.B. No. 5191




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to providing a one-time supplemental payment and a
 cost-of-living adjustment applicable to certain benefits paid by
 the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter H, Chapter 824, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 824.704 to read as follows:
 Sec. 824.704.  COST-OF-LIVING ADJUSTMENT:  JANUARY 2026.
 (a)  Notwithstanding any other section of this subchapter, the
 retirement system shall make a one-time cost-of-living adjustment
 payable to annuitants receiving a monthly death or retirement
 benefit annuity, as provided by this section.
 (b)  Subject to Subsections (c) and (d), to be eligible for
 the adjustment, a person must be, on the effective date of the
 adjustment and disregarding any forfeiture of benefits under
 Section 824.601, an annuitant eligible to receive:
 (1)  a standard service or disability retirement
 annuity payment;
 (2)  an optional service or disability retirement
 annuity payment as either a retiree or beneficiary;
 (3)  an annuity payment under Section 824.402(a)(3) or
 (4);
 (4)  an annuity payment under Section 824.502; or
 (5)  an alternate payee annuity payment under Section
 804.005.
 (c)  If the annuitant:
 (1)  is a retiree, or is a beneficiary under an optional
 retirement payment plan, to be eligible for the adjustment under
 this section:
 (A)  the annuitant must be living on the effective
 date of the adjustment; and
 (B)  the effective date of the retirement of the
 member of the retirement system must have been after August 31,
 2020, but before January 1, 2025;
 (2)  is a beneficiary under Section 824.402(a)(3) or
 (4) or 824.502, to be eligible for the adjustment:
 (A)  the annuitant must be living on the effective
 date of the adjustment; and
 (B)  the date of death of the member of the
 retirement system must have been after August 31, 2020, but before
 January 1, 2025; or
 (3)  is an alternate payee under Section 804.005, the
 annuitant is eligible for the adjustment only if the effective date
 of the election to receive the annuity payment was after August 31,
 2020, but before January 1, 2025.
 (d)  An adjustment made under this section does not apply to
 payments under:
 (1)  Section 824.203(d), relating to retirees who
 receive a standard service retirement annuity in an amount fixed by
 statute;
 (2)  Section 824.304(a), relating to disability
 retirees with less than 10 years of service credit;
 (3)  Section 824.304(b)(2), relating to disability
 retirees who receive a disability annuity in an amount fixed by
 statute;
 (4)  Section 824.404(a), relating to active member
 survivor beneficiaries who receive a survivor annuity in an amount
 fixed by statute;
 (5)  Section 824.501(a), relating to retiree survivor
 beneficiaries who receive a survivor annuity in an amount fixed by
 statute; or
 (6)  Section 824.804(b), relating to participants in
 the deferred retirement option plan with regard to payments from
 their deferred retirement option plan accounts.
 (e)  An adjustment under this section must be made beginning
 with an annuity payable for the month of January 2026.
 (f)  The amount of the adjustment provided under this section
 is calculated by multiplying the amount of the monthly benefit
 subject to the adjustment by two percent.  The adjustment under this
 section is in addition to the adjustments, if any, granted under
 Sections 824.702 and 824.703, or any other law.
 (g)  The board of trustees shall determine the eligibility
 for and the amount of any adjustment in monthly annuities in
 accordance with this section.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  The Teacher Retirement System of Texas
 shall make a supplemental payment of a retirement or death benefit,
 as provided by this section.
 (b)  The supplemental payment is payable in January 2026 and,
 to the extent practicable, on a date or dates that coincide with the
 regular annuity payment payable to each eligible annuitant.
 (c)  The amount of the supplemental payment is equal to the
 gross amount of the regular annuity payment to which the eligible
 annuitant is otherwise entitled for the month of December 2025.
 (d)  The supplemental payment is payable without regard to
 any forfeiture of benefits under Section 824.601, Government Code.
 The Teacher Retirement System of Texas shall make applicable tax
 withholding and other legally required deductions before
 disbursing the supplemental payment. A supplemental payment under
 this section is in addition to and not in lieu of the regular
 monthly annuity payment to which the eligible annuitant is
 otherwise entitled.
 (e)  Subject to Subsection (f) of this section, to be
 eligible for the supplemental payment, a person must be, for the
 month of December 2025, and disregarding any forfeiture of benefits
 under Section 824.601, Government Code, an annuitant eligible to
 receive:
 (1)  a standard retirement annuity payment;
 (2)  an optional retirement annuity payment as either a
 retiree or beneficiary;
 (3)  a life annuity payment under Section
 824.402(a)(4), Government Code;
 (4)  an annuity for a guaranteed period of 60 months
 under Section 824.402(a)(3), Government Code; or
 (5)  an alternate payee annuity payment under Section
 804.005, Government Code.
 (f)  If the annuitant is a retiree or a beneficiary under an
 optional retirement payment plan, to be eligible for the
 supplemental payment, the effective date of the retirement of the
 member of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas must have been
 before December 31, 2024. If the annuitant is a beneficiary under
 Section 824.402(a)(3) or (4), Government Code, to be eligible for
 the supplemental payment, the date of death of the member of the
 retirement system must have been before December 31, 2024. The
 supplemental payment shall be made to an alternate payee who is an
 annuitant under Section 804.005, Government Code, only if the
 annuity payment to the alternate payee commenced before December
 31, 2024. The supplemental payment is in addition to the guaranteed
 number of payments under Section 824.204(c)(3) or (4) or
 824.402(a)(3), Government Code, and may not be counted as one of the
 guaranteed monthly payments.
 (g)  The supplemental payment does not apply to payments
 under:
 (1)  Section 824.304(a), Government Code, relating to
 disability retirees with less than 10 years of service credit;
 (2)  Section 824.304(b)(2), Government Code, relating
 to disability retirees who receive a disability annuity in an
 amount fixed by statute;
 (3)  Section 824.804(b), Government Code, relating to
 participants in the deferred retirement option plan with regard to
 payments from their deferred retirement option plan accounts;
 (4)  Section 824.501(a), Government Code, relating to
 retiree survivor beneficiaries who receive a survivor annuity in an
 amount fixed by statute; or
 (5)  Section 824.404(a), Government Code, relating to
 active member survivor beneficiaries who receive a survivor annuity
 in an amount fixed by statute.
 (h)  Except as provided by this section, the board of
 trustees of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas shall determine
 the eligibility for and the amount and timing of a supplemental
 payment and the manner in which the payment is made.
 SECTION 3.  Section 824.704, Government Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to a monthly benefit payment made by the
 Teacher Retirement System of Texas on or after January 1, 2026.
 SECTION 4.  The Teacher Retirement System of Texas is
 required to make a cost-of-living adjustment under Section 824.704,
 Government Code, as added by this Act, or a one-time supplemental
 payment of benefits under Section 2 of this Act only if the board of
 trustees of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas finds that the
 legislature appropriated money to the retirement system in an
 amount sufficient to provide the adjustment or payment without
 increasing the unfunded actuarial liabilities of the retirement
 system.  The amount appropriated by the legislature to provide the
 adjustment or payment must be in addition to any amounts the state
 is required to contribute to the retirement system under Section
 825.404, Government Code. If the board of trustees of the Teacher
 Retirement System of Texas finds that the legislature did not
 appropriate money in an amount sufficient to provide the
 cost-of-living adjustment or one-time supplemental payment without
 increasing the unfunded actuarial liabilities of the retirement
 system, the retirement system may not make the adjustment or
 payment.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.