LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD Austin, Texas FISCAL NOTE, 89TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION April 29, 2025 TO: Honorable Will Metcalf, Chair, House Committee on Culture, Recreation & Tourism FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board IN RE: HB5259 by Flores (Relating to a wildlife corridor action plan developed by the Parks and Wildlife Department and certain other duties of the department relating to wildlife corridors.), As Introduced Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB5259, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2027. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact toGeneral Revenue Related Funds2026$02027$02028$02029$02030$0All Funds, Five-Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGame,Fish,Water Safety Ac92026($300,000)2027$02028$02029$02030$0 Fiscal AnalysisThe bill would amend the Parks and Wildlife Code to require the Texas Parks and Wildlife Department (TPWD) and the Texas Department of Transportation (TxDOT) to develop a wildlife corridor action plan that recommends and prioritizes wildlife crossing projects intended to promote driver safety and wildlife connectivity as required by the bill. The bill would require TPWD to assist other state agencies and political subdivisions of the state, and any requesting federal agency, to consider and incorporate wildlife corridors, including plan recommendations, developing any governmental strategic plan, map, or action. The bill would require TPWD to submit the plan to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, and Speaker of the House of Representatives no later than December 1, 2026. The bill would also require TPWD to maintain the plan on its website and to update the website as required by the bill. The bill would take effect immediately upon receiving a two-thirds majority vote in both houses; otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2025. The requirement to develop the plan and submit the report to the required offices under the provisions of the bill would expire September 1, 2027. LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD Austin, Texas FISCAL NOTE, 89TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION April 29, 2025 TO: Honorable Will Metcalf, Chair, House Committee on Culture, Recreation & Tourism FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board IN RE: HB5259 by Flores (Relating to a wildlife corridor action plan developed by the Parks and Wildlife Department and certain other duties of the department relating to wildlife corridors.), As Introduced TO: Honorable Will Metcalf, Chair, House Committee on Culture, Recreation & Tourism FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board IN RE: HB5259 by Flores (Relating to a wildlife corridor action plan developed by the Parks and Wildlife Department and certain other duties of the department relating to wildlife corridors.), As Introduced Honorable Will Metcalf, Chair, House Committee on Culture, Recreation & Tourism Honorable Will Metcalf, Chair, House Committee on Culture, Recreation & Tourism Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board HB5259 by Flores (Relating to a wildlife corridor action plan developed by the Parks and Wildlife Department and certain other duties of the department relating to wildlife corridors.), As Introduced HB5259 by Flores (Relating to a wildlife corridor action plan developed by the Parks and Wildlife Department and certain other duties of the department relating to wildlife corridors.), As Introduced Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB5259, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2027. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB5259, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2027. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: 2026 $0 2027 $0 2028 $0 2029 $0 2030 $0 All Funds, Five-Year Impact: 2026 ($300,000) 2027 $0 2028 $0 2029 $0 2030 $0 Fiscal Analysis The bill would amend the Parks and Wildlife Code to require the Texas Parks and Wildlife Department (TPWD) and the Texas Department of Transportation (TxDOT) to develop a wildlife corridor action plan that recommends and prioritizes wildlife crossing projects intended to promote driver safety and wildlife connectivity as required by the bill. The bill would require TPWD to assist other state agencies and political subdivisions of the state, and any requesting federal agency, to consider and incorporate wildlife corridors, including plan recommendations, developing any governmental strategic plan, map, or action. The bill would require TPWD to submit the plan to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, and Speaker of the House of Representatives no later than December 1, 2026. The bill would also require TPWD to maintain the plan on its website and to update the website as required by the bill. The bill would take effect immediately upon receiving a two-thirds majority vote in both houses; otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2025. The requirement to develop the plan and submit the report to the required offices under the provisions of the bill would expire September 1, 2027. The bill would amend the Parks and Wildlife Code to require the Texas Parks and Wildlife Department (TPWD) and the Texas Department of Transportation (TxDOT) to develop a wildlife corridor action plan that recommends and prioritizes wildlife crossing projects intended to promote driver safety and wildlife connectivity as required by the bill. The bill would require TPWD to assist other state agencies and political subdivisions of the state, and any requesting federal agency, to consider and incorporate wildlife corridors, including plan recommendations, developing any governmental strategic plan, map, or action. The bill would require TPWD to submit the plan to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, and Speaker of the House of Representatives no later than December 1, 2026. The bill would also require TPWD to maintain the plan on its website and to update the website as required by the bill. The bill would take effect immediately upon receiving a two-thirds majority vote in both houses; otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2025. The requirement to develop the plan and submit the report to the required offices under the provisions of the bill would expire September 1, 2027. Methodology Based on information provided by TPWD, it is assumed that costs totaling $300,000 in General Revenue-Dedicated Game, Fish and Water Safety Account No. 9 would be necessary in fiscal year 2026 for the purpose of acquiring contracted services to assist with data collection, management, analysis, and modeling and plan creation. According to TPWD, all other costs necessary to implement the provisions of the bill, including technology related costs to maintain the plan on the agency's website and to periodically update the website, could be absorbed using existing resources.Based on information provided by TxDOT, costs associated with consulting with TPWD in the creation of the plan could be absorbed using existing resources. Based on information provided by TPWD, it is assumed that costs totaling $300,000 in General Revenue-Dedicated Game, Fish and Water Safety Account No. 9 would be necessary in fiscal year 2026 for the purpose of acquiring contracted services to assist with data collection, management, analysis, and modeling and plan creation. According to TPWD, all other costs necessary to implement the provisions of the bill, including technology related costs to maintain the plan on the agency's website and to periodically update the website, could be absorbed using existing resources. Based on information provided by TxDOT, costs associated with consulting with TPWD in the creation of the plan could be absorbed using existing resources. Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated. Source Agencies: b > td > 601 Department of Transportation, 802 Parks and Wildlife Department 601 Department of Transportation, 802 Parks and Wildlife Department LBB Staff: b > td > JMc, TUf, MW, RSTE JMc, TUf, MW, RSTE