Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB842 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 11/20/2024

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD     Austin, Texas       FISCAL NOTE, 89TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION             April 22, 2025       TO: Honorable Ken King, Chair, House Committee on State Affairs     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB842 by Lalani (Relating to a study and report on burying power lines in the Gulf Coast region.), As Introduced     Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB842, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($1,000,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2027. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact toGeneral Revenue Related Funds2026($1,000,000)2027$02028$02029$02030$0All Funds, Five-Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund12026($1,000,000)2027$02028$02029$02030$0 Fiscal AnalysisThe bill would require the Public Utility Commission of Texas (PUC) to evaluate the costs, savings, and use of technologies developed for burying power lines in areas within 150 miles of the gulf coast. PUC would be required to submit a report to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, and Speaker of the House no later than September 1, 2026 detailing the findings. The bill would take effect on September 1, 2025 and expire on October 31, 2026.

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 89TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 22, 2025



TO: Honorable Ken King, Chair, House Committee on State Affairs     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB842 by Lalani (Relating to a study and report on burying power lines in the Gulf Coast region.), As Introduced

TO: Honorable Ken King, Chair, House Committee on State Affairs
FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB842 by Lalani (Relating to a study and report on burying power lines in the Gulf Coast region.), As Introduced



Honorable Ken King, Chair, House Committee on State Affairs

Honorable Ken King, Chair, House Committee on State Affairs

Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board

Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB842 by Lalani (Relating to a study and report on burying power lines in the Gulf Coast region.), As Introduced

HB842 by Lalani (Relating to a study and report on burying power lines in the Gulf Coast region.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB842, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($1,000,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2027. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB842, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($1,000,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2027. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact:


2026 ($1,000,000)
2027 $0
2028 $0
2029 $0
2030 $0



All Funds, Five-Year Impact:


2026 ($1,000,000)
2027 $0
2028 $0
2029 $0
2030 $0



Fiscal Analysis

The bill would require the Public Utility Commission of Texas (PUC) to evaluate the costs, savings, and use of technologies developed for burying power lines in areas within 150 miles of the gulf coast. PUC would be required to submit a report to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, and Speaker of the House no later than September 1, 2026 detailing the findings. The bill would take effect on September 1, 2025 and expire on October 31, 2026.

Methodology

This analysis assumes PUC would need to hire a contractor to complete the one-time study in fiscal year 2026. According to the agency and based on a similar study performed through contract for the City of Austin, the estimated cost to produce this study would be $1.0 million.

Technology

PUC anticipates no technology costs.

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: b > td > 473 Public Utility Commission of Texas



473 Public Utility Commission of Texas

LBB Staff: b > td > JMc, WP, GDZ, JBel



JMc, WP, GDZ, JBel