LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD Austin, Texas FISCAL NOTE, 89TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION April 22, 2025 TO: Honorable Ken King, Chair, House Committee on State Affairs FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board IN RE: HB842 by Lalani (Relating to a study and report on burying power lines in the Gulf Coast region.), As Introduced Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB842, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($1,000,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2027. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact toGeneral Revenue Related Funds2026($1,000,000)2027$02028$02029$02030$0All Funds, Five-Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund12026($1,000,000)2027$02028$02029$02030$0 Fiscal AnalysisThe bill would require the Public Utility Commission of Texas (PUC) to evaluate the costs, savings, and use of technologies developed for burying power lines in areas within 150 miles of the gulf coast. PUC would be required to submit a report to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, and Speaker of the House no later than September 1, 2026 detailing the findings. The bill would take effect on September 1, 2025 and expire on October 31, 2026. LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD Austin, Texas FISCAL NOTE, 89TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION April 22, 2025 TO: Honorable Ken King, Chair, House Committee on State Affairs FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board IN RE: HB842 by Lalani (Relating to a study and report on burying power lines in the Gulf Coast region.), As Introduced TO: Honorable Ken King, Chair, House Committee on State Affairs FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board IN RE: HB842 by Lalani (Relating to a study and report on burying power lines in the Gulf Coast region.), As Introduced Honorable Ken King, Chair, House Committee on State Affairs Honorable Ken King, Chair, House Committee on State Affairs Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board HB842 by Lalani (Relating to a study and report on burying power lines in the Gulf Coast region.), As Introduced HB842 by Lalani (Relating to a study and report on burying power lines in the Gulf Coast region.), As Introduced Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB842, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($1,000,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2027. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB842, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($1,000,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2027. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: 2026 ($1,000,000) 2027 $0 2028 $0 2029 $0 2030 $0 All Funds, Five-Year Impact: 2026 ($1,000,000) 2027 $0 2028 $0 2029 $0 2030 $0 Fiscal Analysis The bill would require the Public Utility Commission of Texas (PUC) to evaluate the costs, savings, and use of technologies developed for burying power lines in areas within 150 miles of the gulf coast. PUC would be required to submit a report to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, and Speaker of the House no later than September 1, 2026 detailing the findings. The bill would take effect on September 1, 2025 and expire on October 31, 2026. Methodology This analysis assumes PUC would need to hire a contractor to complete the one-time study in fiscal year 2026. According to the agency and based on a similar study performed through contract for the City of Austin, the estimated cost to produce this study would be $1.0 million. Technology PUC anticipates no technology costs. Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated. Source Agencies: b > td > 473 Public Utility Commission of Texas 473 Public Utility Commission of Texas LBB Staff: b > td > JMc, WP, GDZ, JBel JMc, WP, GDZ, JBel