89R21149 KSM-D By: Lowe H.C.R. No. 123 CONCURRENT RESOLUTION WHEREAS, July 4, 2026, will mark the 250th anniversary of the adoption of the American Declaration of Independence by the Second Continental Congress, which was convened in Philadelphia in 1776; and WHEREAS, Beginning in the 1760s, Great Britain's taxation and frontier policies became increasingly onerous to residents of its 13 North American colonies; their vigorous protests were met with declaration of martial law in Massachusetts and the closing of the port of Boston; delegates from colonial governments met in a Continental Congress to organize a boycott of British goods; as fighting broke out between colonists and British troops in Massachusetts, the Continental Congress coordinated resistance efforts; and WHEREAS, The prospect of reconciliation with Britain grew increasingly unlikely; on December 22, 1775, the British Parliament prohibited trade with the colonies, and the Continental Congress responded the following April by opening colonial ports; Thomas Paine championed the cause of independence in a widely-distributed pamphlet, Common Sense, and on June 7, 1776, Richard Henry Lee introduced a motion in the Continental Congress to declare independence; although not all members were ready to make this break, the Continental Congress formed a committee to write such a declaration, composed of five delegates: Thomas Jefferson, John Adams, Roger Sherman, Robert Livingston, and Benjamin Franklin; and WHEREAS, Mr. Jefferson, a junior delegate from Virginia, was assigned to write the initial draft; drawing on George Mason's Virginia Declaration of Rights, as well as Mr. Jefferson's own drafts of the Virginia Constitution and Summary View of the Rights of British Americans, Mr. Jefferson produced a rough draft in a matter of days; Mr. Adams and Mr. Franklin made revisions, followed by the full committee, which then presented the final version to the full Continental Congress on June 28; and WHEREAS, After voting for independence on July 2, 1776, the Continental Congress made 39 additional revisions to the committee draft; on the morning of July 4, the Declaration of Independence was adopted, a defining moment in the American Revolution; and WHEREAS, The Declaration of Independence consists of 27 grievances against England's King George III in which the colonists outline the complaints that "impel them to the separation" from the "mother country"; among the most familiar and enduring protests has been against the oft-repeated "taxation without representation"--a refrain that continues in use today in various contexts; and WHEREAS, Additionally, the Declaration of Independence asserts "Laws of Nature and of Nature's God" to which a people are "entitle[d]," including the belief that "all men are created equal, that they are endowed by their Creator with certain unalienable Rights, that among these are Life, Liberty and the pursuit of Happiness"; and WHEREAS, The Declaration of Independence provided a firm and enduring foundation for our liberty, and over the course of nearly two and a half centuries, this pivotal document has been a source of inspiration to people the world over; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the 89th Legislature of the State of Texas hereby commemorate the 250th anniversary of the adoption of the Declaration of Independence, which founded the United States of America on July 4, 1776.