Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HR468 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/05/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Meza H.R. No. 468




 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Since the ratification of the Constitution of the
 United States on June 21, 1788, the Congress of the United States
 has had the power "To exercise exclusive Legislation in all Cases
 whatsoever, over such District (not exceeding ten Miles square) as
 may, by Cession of particular States, and the Acceptance of
 Congress, become the Seat of the Government of the United States;"
 and
 WHEREAS, The Seat of the Government of the United States was
 accepted by the Congress of the United States on July 16, 1790 and
 transferred from the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania to the District
 on December 1, 1800 in accordance with the Residence Act of 1790,
 and was organized into the District of Columbia under the entire
 control of the Congress of the United States for every purpose of
 Government on February 27, 1801 in accordance with the District of
 Columbia Organic Act of 1801, through which the residents ceased to
 be considered citizens of a state, no longer entitled to all the
 rights, guaranties, and immunities of the Constitution of the
 United States including, but not limited to: the right to appoint at
 least three Electors in the Electoral College for President and
 Vice President of the United States, the right to elect two Senators
 and at least one Representative in the Congress of the United
 States, and the right to self-govern and ratify proposed amendments
 to the Constitution of the United States, despite continuing to pay
 federal taxes, serve in the military, and share all other
 responsibilities of citizenship of the United States; and
 WHEREAS, A Twenty-Third Amendment to the Constitution of the
 United States was proposed by the Congress of the United States on
 June 16, 1960 and ratified by a sufficient number of states on March
 29, 1961 granting "The District constituting the seat of Government
 of the United States" the right to appoint "A number of electors of
 President and Vice President equal to the whole number of Senators
 and Representatives in Congress to which the District would be
 entitled if it were a State, but in no event more than the least
 populous State;" and
 WHEREAS, The Congress of the United States granted a Delegate
 to the House of Representatives from the District of Columbia, who
 "shall have a seat in the House of Representatives, with the right
 of debate, but not of voting," on September 22, 1970 in accordance
 with the District of Columbia Delegate Act, (after previously
 establishing the position on February 21, 1871 and repealing the
 position on June 20, 1874); and
 WHEREAS, Enactment of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act
 by the Congress of the United States on December 24, 1973 and
 ratification of the Charter Referendum by a majority of the voters
 of the District of Columbia on May 7, 1974, re-organized the
 District of Columbia by granting limited powers of local
 self-government to an elected thirteen-member Council of the
 District of Columbia and an elected Mayor of the District of
 Columbia to "relieve Congress of the burden of legislating upon
 essentially local District matters;" however, the Congress of the
 United States granted no local control over the judiciary and
 reserved "the right, at any time, to exercise its constitutional
 authority as legislature for the District, by enacting legislation
 for the District on any subject, whether within or without the scope
 of legislative power granted to the Council... including
 legislation to amend or repeal any law in force in the District;"
 and
 WHEREAS, Historically, the Congress of the United States and
 the President of the United States have interfered with the
 District of Columbia's local self-government and Home Rule by
 enacting resolutions disapproving, amending, and repealing actions
 of the Council of the District of Columbia and the Mayor of the
 District of Columbia - including cases concerning the location of
 chanceries on December 20, 1979, sexual assault reform on October
 1, 1981, schedule of heights on March 12, 1991, and a revised
 criminal code on March 20, 2023 - and by imposing budget riders that
 control and limit the use of locally-raised tax revenue - including
 cases concerning reproductive health services, cannabis use, and
 statehood advocacy; and
 WHEREAS, On multiple occasions, a majority of the voters of
 the District of Columbia have approved initiatives and referendums
 expressing their desire for statehood, most recently on November 8,
 2016, through which 85.69% of voters 1) agreed that the District
 should be admitted to the union as the State of Washington, D.C., 2)
 approved the Constitution of the State of Washington, D.C., 3)
 approved the proposed boundaries between the State of Washington,
 D.C. and the federal enclave, and 4) agreed that the State of
 Washington, D.C. shall guarantee an elected representative form of
 government; and
 WHEREAS, Other state and territorial legislatures in the
 United States have introduced, debated, and passed resolutions that
 support admitting Washington, D.C. into the Union as a state of the
 United States of America; and
 WHEREAS, Despite the Constitution of the United States
 establishing that "New States may be admitted by the Congress into
 this Union," and despite the United States House of Representatives
 passing the Washington, D.C. Admission Act on June 26, 2020 and
 again on April 22, 2021, which would declare Washington, D.C. to be
 "a State of the United States of America, and is declared admitted
 into the Union on an equal footing with the other States in all
 respects whatever," the Congress of the United States has yet to
 grant full statehood to the approximately 700,000 people of
 Washington, D.C.; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 89th Texas
 Legislature hereby support admitting Washington, D.C. into the
 Union as a state of the United States of America; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 89th Texas
 Legislature hereby oppose efforts by the Congress of the United
 States and the President of the United States that interfere with
 local self-government and Home Rule - including federal laws
 disapproving, amending, and repealing actions of the Council of the
 District of Columbia and the Mayor of the District of Columbia as
 well as federal budget riders that control and limit the use of
 locally-raised tax revenue - and calls on the Congress of the United
 States and the President of the United States to enact federal
 legislation granting statehood to the people of Washington, D.C.;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That copies of this resolution be sent to the
 President of the United States, the Vice President of the United
 States in their capacity as President of the United States Senate,
 the Speaker of the United States House of Representatives, and the
 members of the Texas congressional delegation.