Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HR598 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.R. No. 598




 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The Honorable James Earl Carter Jr., the 39th
 president of the United States and a greatly admired humanitarian,
 passed away on December 29, 2024, at the age of 100; and
 WHEREAS, Jimmy Carter was born in Plains, Georgia, on
 October 1, 1924, to James Earl and Lillian Carter; he entered the
 U.S. Naval Academy during the Second World War and graduated in
 1946, a year after the war's close; he went on to become a U.S. Navy
 lieutenant, serving as a nuclear engineer and submariner; and
 WHEREAS, The young navy midshipman met and fell in love with
 Rosalynn Smith, a friend of his younger sister, and married her just
 weeks after his graduation from the academy and commission into the
 U.S. Navy; following his father's death, he took over the family
 peanut farm back in Georgia and began making a name for himself
 speaking out in favor of Black voting rights and racial
 integration; at the age of 39, he was elected to the Georgia State
 Senate, where he served for four years; and
 WHEREAS, State Senator Carter first ran for governor of
 Georgia in 1966, and he found success in his second bid for that
 office in 1970; in his inaugural speech as the state's 76th
 governor, he powerfully asserted that "the time for racial
 discrimination is over"; as governor, his leadership in efficiency,
 racial justice, and progressive reforms set him up as a national
 figure who would launch a run for president of the United States in
 1976; and
 WHEREAS, Governor Carter was elected as the 39th president of
 the United States, and he earned the distinction of being the most
 recent Democrat to win the State of Texas in a presidential contest;
 his presidency was dedicated to humanitarian advancement at home
 and around the world, and he began his term by pardoning
 approximately 10,000 Vietnam War draft evaders; he also established
 the Departments of Energy and Education and expanded domestic
 environmental conservation efforts, and his administration was
 instrumental in promoting diplomacy abroad; he brokered a peace
 agreement between Egypt and Israel with the Camp David Accords, put
 pressure on oppressive regimes by leveraging economic and military
 aid, and helped secure the release of 52 U.S. citizens during the
 Iran Hostage Crisis; and
 WHEREAS, President Carter left office in 1981, but he did not
 withdraw from public service; he established the Carter Center
 alongside his wife with the purpose to promote human rights,
 democracy, and public health, and the center's many accomplishments
 included negotiating a peace agreement during the Sudan Civil War
 and diplomatically easing U.S. tensions with North Korea as well as
 between Eritrea and Ethiopia; the center has also played a crucial
 role in monitoring and ensuring fair elections in more than 40
 countries, and it helped to build thousands of homes in
 collaboration with Habitat for Humanity; in addition, the Carter
 Center has demonstrated a steadfast commitment to disease
 prevention, specifically empowering initiatives to combat malaria
 and mental health crises, and it has supported efforts to eradicate
 Guinea worm, which, at its height, affected an estimated 3.5
 million people in 20 countries; and
 WHEREAS, Former President Carter and his wife, Rosalynn,
 celebrated 77 years of marriage before her passing on
 November 19, 2023; they are survived by their four children and
 many grandchildren and great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Jimmy Carter devoted his life to public service and
 humanitarianism, and he leaves behind a legacy that will continue
 to inspire generations of Americans for years to come; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 89th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of the Honorable James
 Earl Carter Jr., 39th president of the United States, and express
 deep appreciation for his many years of dedicated public service;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for the Carter Center and the Jimmy Carter Presidential
 Library and Museum.
 Morales of Harris
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 598 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 31, 2025.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House