Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1151 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/07/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Blanco S.B. No. 1151
 (In the Senate - Filed February 6, 2025; February 28, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; April 7, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 7, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an insurer's responsibility to review and audit a
 third-party administrator.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 4151.1042, Insurance
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 4151.1042.  RESPONSIBILITIES OF INSURER; [SEMIANNUAL]
 AUDIT AND REVIEW REQUIREMENTS.
 SECTION 2.  Section 4151.1042(c), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  If an administrator administers benefits for more than
 100 certificate holders, injured employees, plan participants, or
 policyholders on behalf of an insurer, the insurer shall, at least
 semiannually, conduct a review of the operations of the
 administrator. At least biennially, the insurer shall conduct an
 [on-site] audit of the operations of the administrator.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *