Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1184 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/09/2025

                    By: Creighton S.B. No. 1184
 (In the Senate - Filed February 7, 2025; February 28, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 9, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 1; April 9, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the age of wine authorized to be sold by a wine
 collection seller.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 111.002, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 111.002.  AUTHORIZED ACTIVITIES. A wine collection
 seller may sell to a permitted restaurant wine that is:
 (1)  lawfully owned or possessed by the wine collection
 seller;
 (2)  in an original container sealed by the
 manufacturer; and
 (3)  manufactured not less than 10 [20] years before
 the date the wine collection seller sells the wine to a permitted
 restaurant.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *