Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1208 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/10/2025

                    By: King S.B. No. 1208
 (In the Senate - Filed February 10, 2025;
 February 28, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; April 10, 2025, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 10, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to increasing the criminal penalty for the offense of
 interference with public duties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 38.15(b), Penal Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (b)  An offense under this section is a state jail felony
 [Class B misdemeanor].
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *