Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1227 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/27/2025

                    By: Flores S.B. No. 1227
 (In the Senate - Filed February 11, 2025; February 28, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 March 27, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; March 27, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to fees for the issuance of certain military specialty
 license plates.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 504.3015(a) and (b), Transportation
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A person applying for a set of license plates under this
 subchapter shall pay the registration fee required under Chapter
 502 [and the applicable special plate fee required under this
 section], except that one set of license plates shall be issued
 without the payment of the registration fee under:
 (1)  Section 504.308;
 (2)  Section 504.310(b);
 (3)  Section 504.315, other than Subsections (c) and
 (q) of that section; and
 (4)  Section 504.319.
 (b)  Except as otherwise provided by this subchapter, there
 [The fee for the issuance of one set of specialty license plates
 issued under Section 504.315(d) or (g) is $3. There] is no
 additional fee for a specialty license plate issued under [another
 provision of] this subchapter.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *