Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1243 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/07/2025

                    By: Birdwell S.B. No. 1243
 (In the Senate - Filed February 12, 2025;
 February 28, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Local Government; April 7, 2025, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 7, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the dissolution of a public utility agency.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 572.053, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 572.053.  CHANGES IN PUBLIC ENTITIES PARTICIPATING IN
 OR DISSOLUTION OF PUBLIC UTILITY AGENCY. (a) The public entities
 that participate in a public utility agency may by concurrent
 ordinances:
 (1)  add a public entity to, or delete a public entity
 from, participation in the public utility agency; or
 (2)  dissolve the public utility agency and transfer
 all obligations, assets, permits, and licenses of the public
 utility agency to the remaining public entities.
 (b)  A public entity that is the only remaining participant
 in a public utility agency may by ordinance dissolve the public
 utility agency in accordance with Subsection (a)(2).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *