Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1252 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/19/2025

                    By: Schwertner S.B. No. 1252
 (In the Senate - Filed February 12, 2025;
 February 28, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; March 19, 2025, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 1; March 19, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1252 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a municipality to regulate the
 installation or inspection of a residential energy backup system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 214.211, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subdivision (6) to read as follows:
 (6)  "Residential energy backup system" means a backup
 energy system installed at a residential property that is capable
 of providing no more than 50 kilowatts of electricity to the
 residence or has a storage capacity of no more than 100 kilowatt
 hours.
 SECTION 2.  Section 214.214, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsections (d) and (e) to read as follows:
 (d)  A municipality may not adopt or enforce an amendment to
 the National Electrical Code that would regulate the installation
 or inspection of a residential energy backup system.
 (e)  Subsection (d) does not limit the authority of a
 municipally owned utility, as defined by Section 11.003, Utilities
 Code, to regulate the installation or inspection of a residential
 energy backup system within the utility's service area.
 SECTION 3.  The heading to Subchapter C, Chapter 229, Local
 Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER C. REGULATION OF SOLAR ENERGY AND BACKUP ENERGY DEVICES
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter C, Chapter 229, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 229.102 to read as follows:
 Sec. 229.102.  REGULATION OF RESIDENTIAL ENERGY BACKUP
 SYSTEMS. (a)  In this section, "residential energy backup system"
 means a backup energy system installed at a residential property
 that is capable of providing no more than 50 kilowatts of
 electricity to the residence or has a storage capacity of no more
 than 100 kilowatt hours.
 (b)  A municipality may not adopt or enforce an ordinance,
 rule, or other measure that would regulate the installation or
 inspection of a residential energy backup system.
 (c)  This section does not limit the authority of a
 municipally owned utility, as defined by Section 11.003, Utilities
 Code, to regulate the installation or inspection of a residential
 energy backup system within the utility's service area.
 SECTION 5.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 the installation or inspection of a residential energy backup
 system initiated on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *