Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1365 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/02/2025

                    By: Nichols S.B. No. 1365
 (In the Senate - Filed February 18, 2025; March 6, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 2, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 2, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to vehicle registration, license plates, and inspection
 reports.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2001.223, Government Code, as effective
 April 1, 2025, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 2001.223.  EXCEPTIONS FROM DECLARATORY JUDGMENT, COURT
 ENFORCEMENT, AND CONTESTED CASE PROVISIONS. Section 2001.038 and
 Subchapters C through H do not apply to:
 (1)  except as provided by Subchapter D, Chapter 545,
 the granting, payment, denial, or withdrawal of financial or
 medical assistance or benefits under service programs that were
 operated by the former Texas Department of Human Services before
 September 1, 2003, and are operated on and after that date by the
 Health and Human Services Commission or a health and human services
 agency, as defined by Section 521.0001;
 (2)  action by the Banking Commissioner or the Finance
 Commission of Texas regarding the issuance of a state bank or state
 trust company charter for a bank or trust company to assume the
 assets and liabilities of a financial institution that the
 commissioner considers to be in hazardous condition as defined by
 Section 31.002(a) or 181.002(a), Finance Code, as applicable;
 (3)  a hearing or interview conducted by the Board of
 Pardons and Paroles or the Texas Department of Criminal Justice
 relating to the grant, rescission, or revocation of parole or other
 form of administrative release; [or]
 (4)  the suspension, revocation, or termination of the
 certification of a breath analysis operator or technical supervisor
 under the rules of the Department of Public Safety; or
 (5)  the refusal to issue or renew a motor vehicle
 registration or the cancellation, suspension, or revocation of a
 motor vehicle registration under Chapter 502, Transportation Code,
 or rules adopted by the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles under
 that chapter.
 SECTION 2.  Section 502.044, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (a-1) and amending Subsection (e) to read as
 follows:
 (a-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), the department shall
 designate a vehicle registration period of 24 consecutive months to
 begin on the first day of a calendar month and end on the last day of
 the 24th calendar month for a passenger car or light truck that:
 (1)  is sold in this state or purchased by a commercial
 fleet buyer described by Section 501.0234(b)(4) for use in this
 state;
 (2)  has not been previously registered in this or
 another state; and
 (3)  on the date of sale, is of the current or preceding
 model year.
 (e)  The department shall use the date of sale of the vehicle
 in designating the registration period [year] for a vehicle for
 which registration is applied for under Section 501.0234.
 SECTION 3.  Section 502.048, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 502.048.  REFUSAL TO REGISTER UNSAFE VEHICLE. (a)
 Subject to Subsection (b), the [The] department may refuse to
 register a motor vehicle and may cancel, suspend, or revoke a
 registration if the department determines that a motor vehicle is
 unsafe, improperly equipped, or otherwise unfit to be operated on a
 public highway.
 (b)  The department may take action under Subsection (a):
 (1)  only after providing to the owner of the motor
 vehicle for which the registration will be refused, canceled,
 suspended, or revoked notice of the proposed action and an
 opportunity to respond; and
 (2)  without a hearing.
 SECTION 4.  Section 502.360(b), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  In addition to other fees authorized under this chapter,
 at the time of application for registration or renewal of
 registration of an electric vehicle, the applicant shall pay an
 additional fee of[:
 [(1)  $400, for the registration of a new vehicle to
 which Section 548.102 applies; or
 [(2)]  $200[,] for each 12 months of [the] registration
 [or renewal of registration of a vehicle to which Section 548.101
 applies].
 SECTION 5.  Section 503.008(a), Transportation Code, as
 effective July 1, 2025, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The fee for:
 (1)  a dealer's license plate issued under Section
 503.061 is $20 a year; and
 (2)  a dealer's temporary license plate issued under
 Section 503.062 is $10 for an original license plate and $0 for the
 renewal of the same license plate.
 SECTION 6.  Section 503.0633(f), Transportation Code, as
 effective July 1, 2025, is amended to read as follows:
 (f)  If the department determines that a dealer is
 fraudulently obtaining license plates or sets of license plates,
 [or] fraudulently using the database of dealer-issued license
 plates, or obtaining or using vehicle inspection reports described
 by Section 548.603(a)(1), the department may, after giving notice
 electronically and by certified mail to the dealer, deny access to
 the database of dealer-issued license plates to the dealer. A
 dealer denied access to the database of dealer-issued license
 plates under this subsection may request a hearing on the denial as
 provided by Subchapter O, Chapter 2301, Occupations Code.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *