Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1366 Introduced / Analysis

Filed 02/18/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   S.B. 1366     89R10591 RDR-D   By: Nichols         Transportation         3/20/2025         As Filed          AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   Subchapter C, Chapter 1001, of the Texas Education Code mandates 15 topics that are required to be taught in the driver's education curriculum. While the subchapter specifies that information relating to traffic stops must be in the curriculum, information on operating a vehicle in a construction or maintenance work zone is not currently required to be taught by statue.    This bill would amend Texas Education Code by adding Section 1001.1102, which specifies construction or maintenance work zone safety must be taught in driver's education curriculum. The curriculum must teach the dangers associated with violating traffic laws in construction or maintenance work zones as well as the penalties for offenses committed in a construction or maintenance work zone. The Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation will consult with the Department of Public Safety to develop rules for administering this.    Construction work zone safety is a growing issue as there were approximately 27,900 crashes and 215 fatalities in construction work zones on Texas roads in 2024 and approximately 26,300 crashes and 192 fatalities in construction work zones in 2023. This bill aims to increase safety for drivers and construction workers by improving driver's education on this topic.    As proposed, S.B. 1366 amends current law relating to the inclusion of information about construction or maintenance work zones in the curriculum of driver education and driving safety courses.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   Rulemaking authority is expressly granted to the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation in SECTION 1 (Section 1001.1102, Education Code) of this bill.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Subchapter C, Chapter 1001, Education Code, by adding Section 1001.1102, as follows:   Sec. 1001.1102. INFORMATION RELATING TO OPERATING VEHICLE IN CONSTRUCTION OR MAINTENANCE WORK ZONE. (a) Requires the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation (TCLR) by rule to require that information relating to construction or maintenance work zones be included in the curriculum of each driver education course or driving safety course. Requires that the curriculum include:   (1) the dangers associated with violating traffic laws in construction or maintenance work zones; and    (2) the penalties under Section 542.404 (Fine for Offense in Construction or Maintenance Work Zone), Transportation Code, for certain offenses committed in a construction or maintenance work zone.   (b) Requires TCLR, in developing rules under this section, to consult with the Department of Public Safety.   SECTION 2. (a) Requires TCLR, not later than May 1, 2026, to adopt the rules required by Section 1001.1102, Education Code, as added by this Act.   (b) Requires that each driver education course or driving safety course held on or after September 1, 2026, include in the course's curriculum the information required by the rules adopted under Section 1001.1102, Education Code, as added by this Act.   SECTION 3. Effective date: September 1, 2025.

BILL ANALYSIS

Senate Research Center S.B. 1366
89R10591 RDR-D By: Nichols
 Transportation
 3/20/2025
 As Filed



Senate Research Center

S.B. 1366

89R10591 RDR-D

By: Nichols

Transportation

3/20/2025

As Filed

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

Subchapter C, Chapter 1001, of the Texas Education Code mandates 15 topics that are required to be taught in the driver's education curriculum. While the subchapter specifies that information relating to traffic stops must be in the curriculum, information on operating a vehicle in a construction or maintenance work zone is not currently required to be taught by statue.

This bill would amend Texas Education Code by adding Section 1001.1102, which specifies construction or maintenance work zone safety must be taught in driver's education curriculum. The curriculum must teach the dangers associated with violating traffic laws in construction or maintenance work zones as well as the penalties for offenses committed in a construction or maintenance work zone. The Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation will consult with the Department of Public Safety to develop rules for administering this.

Construction work zone safety is a growing issue as there were approximately 27,900 crashes and 215 fatalities in construction work zones on Texas roads in 2024 and approximately 26,300 crashes and 192 fatalities in construction work zones in 2023. This bill aims to increase safety for drivers and construction workers by improving driver's education on this topic.

As proposed, S.B. 1366 amends current law relating to the inclusion of information about construction or maintenance work zones in the curriculum of driver education and driving safety courses.

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

Rulemaking authority is expressly granted to the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation in SECTION 1 (Section 1001.1102, Education Code) of this bill.

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

SECTION 1. Amends Subchapter C, Chapter 1001, Education Code, by adding Section 1001.1102, as follows:

Sec. 1001.1102. INFORMATION RELATING TO OPERATING VEHICLE IN CONSTRUCTION OR MAINTENANCE WORK ZONE. (a) Requires the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation (TCLR) by rule to require that information relating to construction or maintenance work zones be included in the curriculum of each driver education course or driving safety course. Requires that the curriculum include:

(1) the dangers associated with violating traffic laws in construction or maintenance work zones; and

(2) the penalties under Section 542.404 (Fine for Offense in Construction or Maintenance Work Zone), Transportation Code, for certain offenses committed in a construction or maintenance work zone.

(b) Requires TCLR, in developing rules under this section, to consult with the Department of Public Safety.

SECTION 2. (a) Requires TCLR, not later than May 1, 2026, to adopt the rules required by Section 1001.1102, Education Code, as added by this Act.

(b) Requires that each driver education course or driving safety course held on or after September 1, 2026, include in the course's curriculum the information required by the rules adopted under Section 1001.1102, Education Code, as added by this Act.

SECTION 3. Effective date: September 1, 2025.