Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1422 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 04/14/2025

                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   S.B. 1422     89R13407 RDR-D   By: Hughes         Transportation         4/14/2025         As Filed          AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   Petty Officer Billy W. Machen served in the U.S. Navy and was a resident of Gilmer, Texas. He enlisted in the U.S. Navy on July 9, 1957, and served in the Navy for nearly a decade. At the end of his service, he served with SEAL Team ONE, and was deployed to South Vietnam from July 1966 until he was killed in action on August 19, 1966 on a combat mission. He died protecting his team members, giving them time to seek cover, form hasty defensive perimeter, and escape unharmed after suppressing enemy fire. He was posthumously promoted to Petty Officer 1st Class, and was buried at the Willow Oak B.C. Cemetery in Gilmer, Texas.    In honor of his incredible service to his country, and for his courageous actions in combat, S.B. 1422 proposes that the Farm-to-Market Road 852 bridge crossing Lake Gilmer in Upshur County be designated as the Petty Officer Billy Machen Bridge, in addition to any other designations.   As proposed, S.B. 1422 amends current law relating to the designation of a portion of Farm-to-Market Road 852 in Upshur County as the Petty Officer Billy Machen Bridge.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code, by adding Section 225.243, as follows:   Sec. 225.243. PETTY OFFICER BILLY MACHEN BRIDGE. (a) Provides that the Farm-to-Market Road 852 bridge crossing Lake Gilmer in Upshur County is designated as the Petty Officer Billy Machen Bridge. Provides that the designation is in addition to any other designation.   (b) Requires the Texas Department of Transportation (TxDOT), subject to Section 225.021(c) (relating to prohibiting TxDOT from designing, constructing, or erecting a marker unless a grant or donation of funds is made to cover the cost), to design and construct markers indicating the designation as the Petty Officer Billy Machen Bridge and any other appropriate information and erect a marker at each end of the bridge.   SECTION 2. Provides that it is the intent of the 89th Legislature, Regular Session, 2025, that the provisions added by this Act be renumbered to prevent multiple provisions with the same designation.   SECTION 3. Effective date: September 1, 2025.

BILL ANALYSIS

Senate Research Center S.B. 1422
89R13407 RDR-D By: Hughes
 Transportation
 4/14/2025
 As Filed



Senate Research Center

S.B. 1422

89R13407 RDR-D

By: Hughes

Transportation

4/14/2025

As Filed

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

Petty Officer Billy W. Machen served in the U.S. Navy and was a resident of Gilmer, Texas. He enlisted in the U.S. Navy on July 9, 1957, and served in the Navy for nearly a decade. At the end of his service, he served with SEAL Team ONE, and was deployed to South Vietnam from July 1966 until he was killed in action on August 19, 1966 on a combat mission. He died protecting his team members, giving them time to seek cover, form hasty defensive perimeter, and escape unharmed after suppressing enemy fire. He was posthumously promoted to Petty Officer 1st Class, and was buried at the Willow Oak B.C. Cemetery in Gilmer, Texas.

In honor of his incredible service to his country, and for his courageous actions in combat, S.B. 1422 proposes that the Farm-to-Market Road 852 bridge crossing Lake Gilmer in Upshur County be designated as the Petty Officer Billy Machen Bridge, in addition to any other designations.

As proposed, S.B. 1422 amends current law relating to the designation of a portion of Farm-to-Market Road 852 in Upshur County as the Petty Officer Billy Machen Bridge.

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

SECTION 1. Amends Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code, by adding Section 225.243, as follows:

Sec. 225.243. PETTY OFFICER BILLY MACHEN BRIDGE. (a) Provides that the Farm-to-Market Road 852 bridge crossing Lake Gilmer in Upshur County is designated as the Petty Officer Billy Machen Bridge. Provides that the designation is in addition to any other designation.

(b) Requires the Texas Department of Transportation (TxDOT), subject to Section 225.021(c) (relating to prohibiting TxDOT from designing, constructing, or erecting a marker unless a grant or donation of funds is made to cover the cost), to design and construct markers indicating the designation as the Petty Officer Billy Machen Bridge and any other appropriate information and erect a marker at each end of the bridge.

SECTION 2. Provides that it is the intent of the 89th Legislature, Regular Session, 2025, that the provisions added by this Act be renumbered to prevent multiple provisions with the same designation.

SECTION 3. Effective date: September 1, 2025.