Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1422 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/16/2025

                    By: Hughes S.B. No. 1422
 (In the Senate - Filed February 19, 2025; March 6, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 16, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 16, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of Farm-to-Market Road 852
 in Upshur County as the Petty Officer Billy Machen Bridge.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.243 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.243.  PETTY OFFICER BILLY MACHEN BRIDGE. (a)  The
 Farm-to-Market Road 852 bridge crossing Lake Gilmer in Upshur
 County is designated as the Petty Officer Billy Machen Bridge.  The
 designation is in addition to any other designation.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the
 Petty Officer Billy Machen Bridge and any other
 appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the bridge.
 SECTION 2.  It is the intent of the 89th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2025, that the provisions added by this Act be renumbered
 to prevent multiple provisions with the same designation.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *