Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1450 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/24/2025

                    By: Bettencourt S.B. No. 1450
 (In the Senate - Filed February 19, 2025; March 6, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 March 24, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; March 24, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to third-party review of development documents and
 inspection of improvements required to be approved by a political
 subdivision.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 247.002, Local Government Code, as added
 by Chapter 654 (H.B. 14), Acts of the 88th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2023, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 247.002.  THIRD-PARTY REVIEW OR INSPECTION REQUIRED.
 (a)  If a regulatory authority does not approve, conditionally
 approve, or disapprove a development document, including a
 development permit, by the 15th day after the date prescribed by a
 provision of this code for the approval, conditional approval, or
 disapproval of the document, any required review of the document
 may be performed by a person:
 (1)  other than:
 (A)  the applicant; or
 (B)  a person whose work is the subject of the
 application; and
 (2)  who is:
 (A)  employed by the regulatory authority to
 review development documents;
 (B)  employed by another political subdivision to
 review development documents, if the regulatory authority has
 approved the person to review development documents; or
 (C)  an engineer licensed under Chapter 1001,
 Occupations Code.
 (b)  If a regulatory authority does not conduct a required
 development inspection by the 15th day after the date prescribed by
 a provision of this code for conducting the inspection, the
 inspection may be conducted by a person:
 (1)  other than:
 (A)  the owner of the land or improvement to the
 land that is the subject of the inspection; or
 (B)  a person whose work is the subject of the
 inspection; and
 (2)  who is:
 (A)  certified [to inspect buildings] by the
 International Code Council;
 (B)  employed by the regulatory authority as a
 building inspector;
 (C)  employed by another political subdivision as
 a building inspector, if the regulatory authority has approved the
 person to perform inspections; or
 (D)  an engineer licensed under Chapter 1001,
 Occupations Code.
 (c)  A political subdivision is not liable for a review or
 inspection performed by a third party under this chapter.
 SECTION 2.  Section 247.002(a), Local Government Code, as
 amended by this Act, and Section 247.002(c), Local Government Code,
 as added by this Act, are intended to clarify rather than change
 existing law.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *