Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1464 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/27/2025

                    By: Hinojosa of Hidalgo S.B. No. 1464
 (In the Senate - Filed February 20, 2025; March 6, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 March 27, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; March 27, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a hearing on the refusal to issue or the revocation or
 suspension of a vehicle title.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 501.052, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsections (a) and (f) and adding Subsection (g) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (f), an [An]
 interested person aggrieved by a refusal, rescission,
 cancellation, suspension, or revocation under Section 501.051 may
 apply for a hearing to the county assessor-collector for the county
 in which the person is a resident.  On the day an assessor-collector
 receives the application, the assessor-collector shall notify the
 department of the date of the hearing.
 (f)  A person may not apply for a hearing under this section
 if the department's decision under Section 501.051 is related to:
 (1)  a title for a salvage motor vehicle or a
 nonrepairable motor vehicle, as defined by Section 501.091; or
 (2)  a title for a vehicle:
 (A)  that is the subject of any pending litigation
 or court proceedings;
 (B)  for which a court has awarded ownership or
 possession to another person; or
 (C)  that is held as evidence in a criminal
 investigation.
 (g)  A county assessor-collector who receives an application
 for a hearing submitted in violation of Subsection (f):
 (1)  shall deny the application; and
 (2)  is not required to send notice under Subsection
 (a) or hold a hearing under Subsection (b).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *