Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1494 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/31/2025

                    By: Johnson, West S.B. No. 1494
 (In the Senate - Filed February 20, 2025; March 6, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 31, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10,
 Nays 0; March 31, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of certain political subdivisions to
 change the date of their general elections.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 41.0052(a), Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The governing body of a political subdivision, other
 than a county or municipal utility district, that holds its general
 election for officers on a date other than the November uniform
 election date may, not later than December 31, 2026 [2016], change
 the date on which it holds its general election for officers to the
 November uniform election date.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *