Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1568 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/28/2025

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1568
 (In the Senate - Filed February 24, 2025; March 6, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 28, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 28, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1568 By:  West




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of animal friendly specialty license
 plates.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 504.605, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (a-1) and amending Subsection (b) to read as
 follows:
 (a-1)  In addition to the license plates required under
 Subsection (a), the department shall issue specialty license plates
 including the words "Spay. Neuter. Adopt." The department shall
 design the license plates.
 (b)  After deduction of the department's administrative
 costs, the remainder of the fee for issuance of [the] license plates
 under Subsection (a) or (a-1) shall be deposited to the credit of
 the animal friendly account established by Section 828.014, Health
 and Safety Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *