Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1626 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/14/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hughes S.B. No. 1626
 (In the Senate - Filed February 25, 2025; March 11, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 14, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 14, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1626 By:  Paxton




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to censorship of or certain other interference with
 digital expression, including expression on social media platforms
 or through electronic mail messages.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The legislature finds that:
 (1)  although H.B. 20, as passed by the 87th
 Legislature, 2nd Called Session, 2021, clearly applies to social
 media platforms only in their role as common carriers in
 facilitating public forums for public debate, the legislation has
 been misunderstood to apply more broadly and therefore requires
 clarification;
 (2)  an effective state remedy for social media
 censorship is essential because:
 (A)  the federal government has massively used the
 dominant social media platforms to abridge the freedom of speech;
 (B)  the combination of qualified immunity
 impeding damages for past censorship and doctrinal limits on
 injunctions against the breadth of future censorship leaves Texans
 and other Americans without adequate judicial remedies for federal
 censorship;
 (C)  dominant common carriers, especially when
 given exaggerated dominance by federal privilege, pressure, and
 coordination, must be available to persons of all points of view,
 without discrimination; and
 (D)  the public square, which is now mainly on the
 Internet and is enabled by the dominant social media platforms,
 must be available to persons of all points of view, without
 discrimination;
 (3)  damages are necessary for violations of H.B. 20
 because, even though private enforcement of the legislation has
 never been enjoined, the platforms subject to the legislation have
 never complied with it;
 (4)  the First Amendment to the U.S. Constitution bars
 the federal government from "abridging" the freedom of speech or of
 the press, not merely coercing or otherwise "prohibiting" it;
 (5)  states have a structurally essential role, dating
 back to the Sedition Act of 1798, of protecting individuals from
 federal censorship; and
 (6)  since H.B. 20 was originally enacted:
 (A)  abundant evidence has come to light that the
 federal government has massively used dominant social media
 platforms to abridge the freedom of speech;
 (B)  it has become clear that common carrier
 legislation like H.B. 20 is the only sort of legal mechanism that
 can promptly and effectively prevent federal censorship through the
 social media platforms; and
 (C)  this state has a compelling and even
 existential interest in adopting this law to prevent the federal
 threat to the freedom of speech.
 SECTION 2.  Section 120.001(1), Business & Commerce Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (1)  "Social media platform" means an Internet website
 or application that is open to the public, allows a user to create
 an account, and enables users to communicate with other users for
 the primary purpose of posting information, comments, messages, or
 images.  The term does not include:
 (A)  an Internet service provider as defined by
 Section 324.055;
 (B)  electronic mail, including direct messaging
 or other electronically conveyed mail; or
 (C)  an online service, application, or website:
 (i)  that:
 (a)  consists primarily of news,
 sports, entertainment, or other information or content that is not
 user generated but is preselected by the provider; or
 (b)  primarily provides banking,
 financial, transportation, or sales services, services related to
 the playing or creation of video games, or another service that is
 not a communications service; and
 (ii)  for which any chat, comments, or
 interactive functionality is incidental to, directly related to, or
 dependent on the provision of the content or service described by
 Subparagraph (i).
 SECTION 3.  Section 143A.004(c), Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (c)  This chapter applies only to a social media platform
 that functionally has more than 65 [50] million active users in the
 United States in a calendar month.
 SECTION 4.  Section 143A.005, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 143A.005.  LIMITATION ON EFFECT OF CHAPTER;
 INTERPRETATION OF CHAPTER.  (a)  This chapter does not subject a
 social media platform to damages or other legal remedies to the
 extent the social media platform is protected from those remedies
 under federal law.
 (b)  This chapter does not apply to a social media platform's
 newsfeed, the platform's own homepage, or any other service that
 is:
 (1)  intended to convey a particularized message where
 the likelihood is great that such a message would be understood by
 the viewer;
 (2)  not a common carrier service;
 (3)  not strongly analogous to a common carrier
 service; or
 (4)  not primarily providing transmission of users'
 expression.
 (c)  Nothing in this chapter may be interpreted to permit a
 social media platform to discriminate in the carriage of users'
 expression by disseminating the platform's own commentary or
 expression in a manner that delays or otherwise diminishes the
 visibility of a user's expression, or delays or otherwise denies
 equal access to a user's expression, or otherwise censors a user's
 expression, on the basis of viewpoint in violation of this chapter.
 SECTION 5.  Section 143A.007(b), Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  If the user proves that the social media platform
 violated this chapter with respect to the user, the user is entitled
 to recover:
 (1)  declaratory relief under Chapter 37, including
 costs and reasonable and necessary attorney's fees under Section
 37.009; [and]
 (2)  injunctive relief;
 (3)  either:
 (A)  actual damages; or
 (B)  at the election of the user, statutory
 damages in the amount of:
 (i)  $100,000 if the user or the user's
 expression was censored in violation of Section 143A.002; or
 (ii)  $1,000 if the user's ability to receive
 another person's expression was censored in violation of Section
 143A.002; and
 (4)  reasonable and necessary attorney's fees.
 SECTION 6.  Section 143A.007(b), Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, as amended by this Act, applies only to a cause of action that
 accrues on or after the effective date of this Act.  A cause of
 action that accrued before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law as it existed immediately before the effective
 date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *