Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1663 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/07/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1663
 (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2025; March 11, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Water, Agriculture and
 Rural Affairs; April 7, 2025, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 7, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to notification procedures concerning groundwater
 contamination.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 26.408(b), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  As soon as practicable but not [Not] later than the 30th
 day after the date the commission receives notice under Subsection
 (a) or obtains independent knowledge of groundwater contamination,
 the commission shall make every effort to give notice of the
 contamination by first class mail, e-mail, notice placed on the
 door of a residence, or another effective delivery method to:
 (1)  each owner of a private drinking water well that
 may be affected by the contamination;
 (2)  [and to] each applicable groundwater conservation
 district; and
 (3)  the residents of each residential address within
 one mile of the site of the contamination.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *