By: Menéndez S.B. No. 1681 (In the Senate - Filed February 27, 2025; March 11, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services; April 28, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 28, 2025, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to an annual boarding home facility report for certain counties and municipalities. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Chapter 260, Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Section 260.0105 to read as follows: Sec. 260.0105. COUNTY AND MUNICIPALITY REPORTING REQUIREMENTS. (a) Not later than September 30 of each year, each county or municipality that regulates boarding home facilities, including a county or municipality that requires a person to obtain a permit to operate a boarding home facility as authorized by Section 260.004, shall submit to the commission in the form and manner the commission requires a written report that includes: (1) the county's or municipality's standards or ordinances applicable to boarding home facilities in effect on the date the report is submitted; (2) any policies or procedures the county or municipality requires to consider a resident's or prospective resident's reasonable accommodation request; (3) during the preceding year, the total number of: (A) reasonable accommodation requests received, approved, and rejected, including the reason a request was rejected; (B) complaints or actions brought against a boarding home facility located in the county or municipality related to a violation of federal or state fair housing laws; and (C) boarding home facility closures, including the reason a facility closed and the accommodations provided to the facility's former residents; (4) information on any activities the county or municipality performs to support the operators of boarding home facilities in complying with applicable regulations; and (5) a summary of complaints the county or municipality receives against boarding home facilities located in the county or municipality. (b) Each county or municipality shall report to the commission any updates made to the standards or ordinances described by Subsection (a)(1) after the report is submitted under that subsection. A county or municipality shall report the updates in the form and manner the commission requires. (c) The executive commissioner may adopt rules as necessary to implement this section. SECTION 2. Notwithstanding Section 260.0105, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, a county or municipality is not required to submit a report required by that section until September 30, 2026. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025. * * * * *