Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1784 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/14/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Parker S.B. No. 1784
 (In the Senate - Filed February 28, 2025; March 13, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; April 14, 2025, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 14, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to notice provided by a health care provider before
 initiating debt collection against a patient.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 185, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 185.004 to read as follows:
 Sec. 185.004.  REQUIRED NOTICE OF DEBT COLLECTION. A health
 care provider that intends to pursue debt collection for a health
 care service or supply provided to a patient shall provide written
 notice to the patient at least 60 days before the date the provider
 initiates debt collection.
 SECTION 2.  Section 185.004, Health and Safety Code, as
 added by this Act, applies only to debt collection initiated on or
 after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *