Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1919 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: West S.B. No. 1919
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2025; March 17, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 2, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 2, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the Texas Department of Transportation
 to settle certain claims.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 201.106(b), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The department may settle a claim described by
 Subsection (a) if:
 (1)  the department may be liable under Chapter 101,
 Civil Practice and Remedies Code;
 (2)  the director determines that a settlement is in
 the best interest of the department; and
 (3)  the department's liability under the terms of the
 settlement is less than $100,000 [$10,000].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *