Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1924 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/07/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Creighton S.B. No. 1924
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2025; March 17, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education K-16;
 April 7, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 1; April 7, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1924 By:  Middleton




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the enforcement of certain criminal offenses on school
 property.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 45A.453(h), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (h)  Except as provided by Subsection (i) [and Section
 37.143(a), Education Code], for a traffic offense or an offense
 punishable by fine only, a law enforcement officer may issue a
 citation as provided by Article 14.06 instead of taking a child into
 custody.
 SECTION 2.  Section 28.025(c), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  A person may receive a diploma if the person is eligible
 for a diploma under Section 28.0251. In other cases, a student may
 graduate and receive a diploma only if:
 (1)  the student successfully completes the curriculum
 requirements identified by the State Board of Education under
 Subsection (a) and complies with Sections 28.0256, 28.02565, and
 39.025; or
 (2)  the student successfully completes an
 individualized education program developed under Section 29.005.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter B, Chapter 28, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 28.02565 to read as follows:
 Sec. 28.02565.  COMPLETION OF COMMUNITY SERVICE AND PAYMENT
 OF FINES AND COSTS REQUIRED FOR SCHOOL OFFENSES BEFORE HIGH SCHOOL
 GRADUATION. A student who has been convicted of or placed on
 deferred adjudication community supervision for a school offense,
 as defined by Section 37.141, may not graduate from high school and
 receive a diploma unless the court in which the student was
 convicted certifies to the school district or open-enrollment
 charter school in which the student is enrolled that the student has
 discharged all obligations to perform community service and pay
 fines and costs imposed for that offense.
 SECTION 4.  Section 37.143, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 37.143.  [CITATION PROHIBITED;] CUSTODY OF CHILD. [(a)
 A peace officer, law enforcement officer, or school resource
 officer may not issue a citation to a child who is alleged to have
 committed a school offense.
 [(b)]  This subchapter does not prohibit a child from being
 taken into custody under Section 52.01, Family Code.
 SECTION 5.  Section 37.144, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (a-1), a [A] school
 district that commissions peace officers under Section 37.081 may
 develop a system of graduated sanctions that the school district
 may require to be imposed on a child before a complaint is filed
 under Section 37.145 against the child for a school offense that is
 an offense under Section 37.124 or 37.126 or under Section
 42.01(a)(1), (2), (3), (4), or (5), Penal Code. A system adopted
 under this section must include multiple graduated sanctions. The
 system may require:
 (1)  a warning letter to be issued to the child and the
 child's parent or guardian that specifically states the child's
 alleged school offense and explains the consequences if the child
 engages in additional misconduct;
 (2)  a behavior contract with the child that must be
 signed by the child, the child's parent or guardian, and an employee
 of the school and that includes a specific description of the
 behavior that is required or prohibited for the child and the
 penalties for additional alleged school offenses, including
 additional disciplinary action or the filing of a complaint in a
 criminal court;
 (3)  the performance of school-based community service
 by the child; and
 (4)  the referral of the child to counseling,
 community-based services, or other in-school or out-of-school
 services aimed at addressing the child's behavioral problems.
 (a-1)  A school district may not adopt a system of graduated
 sanctions before filing a complaint under Section 37.145 against a
 child for a school offense if the conduct that constituted the
 offense:
 (1)  posed an imminent threat to a teacher's safety; or
 (2)  resulted in physical harm to a teacher.
 SECTION 6.  Section 37.145, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 37.145.  CITATION OR COMPLAINT. (a) If a child is
 alleged to have committed a school offense:
 (1)  a peace officer, law enforcement officer, or
 school resource officer may issue a citation to the child;
 (2)  [If a child fails to comply with or complete
 graduated sanctions under Section 37.144, or if the school district
 has not elected to adopt a system of graduated sanctions under that
 section,] the school may file a complaint against the child with a
 criminal court in accordance with Section 37.146, if:
 (A)  the child fails to comply with or complete
 graduated sanctions under Section 37.144; or
 (B)  the school district has not elected to adopt
 a system of graduated sanctions under Section 37.144; or
 (3)  for a school offense described by Section
 37.144(a-1), the school shall file a complaint against the child
 with a criminal court in accordance with Section 37.146 unless the
 school has been notified under Subsection (b) that a peace officer,
 law enforcement officer, or school resource officer has issued a
 citation to the child for the alleged offense.
 (b)  A peace officer, law enforcement officer, or school
 resource officer who issues a citation to a child for a school
 offense under Subsection (a)(1) shall notify the child's school of
 the issuance of the citation.
 (c)  A peace officer, law enforcement officer, or school
 resource officer who issues a citation to a child under Subsection
 (a)(1) or a school that files a complaint against a child under
 Subsection (a)(2) or (3) shall immediately provide to the parent of
 or person standing in parental relation to the child a written
 notice regarding the issuance of the citation or filing of the
 complaint that includes:
 (1)  an explanation of the child's and parent's or
 person's rights under the law related to the issuance of the
 citation to or filing of the complaint against the child, including
 the right to legal counsel; and
 (2)  the potential consequences of the issuance of the
 citation to or filing of the complaint against the child, including
 the child's possible arrest.
 (d)  The Office of Court Administration of the Texas Judicial
 System shall adopt a model notice for a peace officer, law
 enforcement officer, school resource officer, or school to use for
 purposes of Subsection (c).
 SECTION 7.  Subchapter E-1, Chapter 37, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 37.1455 to read as follows:
 Sec. 37.1455.  REPORT ON CITATIONS. (a) Not later than the
 60th day after the last day of classes for the school year, a school
 district or open-enrollment charter school shall provide to the
 agency, in the form and manner prescribed by commissioner rule, a
 report on the number of citations issued to students enrolled in the
 district or school during the preceding school year, disaggregated
 by:
 (1)  the offense for which the citation was issued;
 (2)  the student's race;
 (3)  the student's sex;
 (4)  the student's age;
 (5)  the student's grade level;
 (6)  whether the student is eligible for the district's
 or school's special education program under Subchapter A, Chapter
 29; and
 (7)  whether the student is educationally
 disadvantaged.
 (b)  The agency shall compile the information reported under
 Subsection (a) and publish a report on the information on the
 agency's Internet website.
 (c)  A report required under Subsection (a) or (b) may be
 combined with another report required under other law.
 SECTION 8.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 9.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *