Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1927 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/14/2025

                    By: Hinojosa of Nueces S.B. No. 1927
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2025; March 17, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 April 14, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 2; April 14, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1927 By:  Nichols




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to municipal regulation of the removal of an Ashe juniper
 tree.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 212.905, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (h) and adding Subsection (h-1) to
 read as follows:
 (h)  A municipality may not prohibit the removal of or impose
 a tree mitigation fee for the removal of [a tree that]:
 (1)  a tree that is diseased or dead; [or]
 (2)  a tree that poses an imminent or immediate threat
 to persons or property; or
 (3)  except as provided by Subsection (h-1), an Ashe
 juniper tree located on a residential property.
 (h-1)  Subsection (h)(3) does not apply to an area located:
 (1)  within 15 miles of the boundary of a military base,
 as defined by Section 43.0117, at which an active training program
 is conducted; and
 (2)  in a county with a population of more than two
 million.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *