Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1936 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/10/2025

                    By: Hinojosa of Hidalgo S.B. No. 1936
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2025; March 17, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 10, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; April 10, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the definition of an abuse unit for certain controlled
 substances under the Texas Controlled Substances Act.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 481.002(50), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (50)  "Abuse unit" means:
 (A)  except as provided by Paragraph (B):
 (i)  a single unit on or in any adulterant,
 dilutant, or similar carrier medium, including marked or perforated
 blotter paper, a tablet, gelatin wafer, sugar cube, or stamp, or
 other medium that contains any amount of a controlled substance
 listed in Penalty Group 1-A, if the unit is commonly used in abuse
 of that substance; or
 (ii)  each 10 milligrams [quarter-inch
 square section] of paper, calculated by rounding the weight down to
 the nearest whole number, if the adulterant, dilutant, or carrier
 medium is paper not marked or perforated into individual abuse
 units; or
 (B)  if the controlled substance is in liquid or
 solid form, 40 micrograms of the controlled substance including any
 adulterant or dilutant.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *