Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1939 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/31/2025

                    By: Hinojosa of Hidalgo S.B. No. 1939
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2025; March 17, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 March 31, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 31, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1939 By:  Hinojosa of Hidalgo


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the ship channel improvement revolving fund.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 403.0956, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 403.0956.  REALLOCATION OF INTEREST ACCRUED ON CERTAIN
 DEDICATED REVENUE. Notwithstanding any other law, all interest or
 other earnings that accrue on all revenue held in an account in the
 general revenue fund any part of which Section 403.095 makes
 available for certification under Section 403.121 are available for
 any general governmental purpose, and the comptroller shall deposit
 the interest and earnings to the credit of the general revenue fund.
 This section does not apply to:
 (1)  interest or earnings on revenue deposited in
 accordance with Section 51.008, Education Code;
 (2)  an account that accrues interest or other earnings
 on deposits of state or federal money the diversion of which is
 specifically excluded by federal law;
 (3)  the lifetime license endowment account;
 (4)  the game, fish, and water safety account;
 (5)  the coastal protection account;
 (6)  the Alamo complex account;
 (7)  the artificial reef account;
 (8)  the sexual assault program fund; [or]
 (9)  the deferred maintenance fund account; or
 (10)  the ship channel improvement revolving fund.
 SECTION 2.  Section 56.002(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The ship channel improvement revolving fund is a
 separate [an] account in the state highway [general revenue] fund.
 The fund is administered by the commission.
 SECTION 3.  On the effective date of this Act, the
 comptroller of public accounts shall transfer the unencumbered
 balance of the ship channel improvement revolving fund established
 under Chapter 56, Transportation Code, to an account of the same
 name in the state highway fund.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *